Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01003
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Dec 20, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.
Represented By
Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/20 10:48 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 10, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/10 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 12/8/2017)
Friday, December 08, 2017
23 23 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Fri 12/08 12:36 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+] (Order entered on 12/8/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
22 22 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 12/08 12:10 PM
****DOCKETED IN ERROR***ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+] Modified on 12/8/2017 (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Wed 07/12 10:31 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due 10/10/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/16/2017. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 09, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/09 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Regarding (related document(s):19 Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2017 .) (Order entered on 7/7/2017)
Friday, July 07, 2017
20 20 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 07/07 12:25 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 7/7/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2017 .
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 07/07 12:28 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 11/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 1 Discovery due 10/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 10/25/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/16/2014. (Chapman, Anita) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, July 06, 2017
19 19 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 07/06 3:34 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 7/7/2017 (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 23, 2017
18 18 misc Certificate of Service (Adversary) Thu 03/23 10:10 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Ruffner, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service (Adversary) Thu 03/23 10:09 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Ruffner, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/08 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Regarding (related document(s):12 Motion Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice)) (Order entered on 3/6/2017)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/08 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 (Order entered on 3/6/2017)) Notice Date 03/08/2017. (Admin.
Monday, March 06, 2017
14 14 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 03/06 1:54 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 3/6/2017) (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice)
13 13 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 03/06 10:21 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 (Order entered on 3/6/2017) (Farrar, Ronda
Friday, March 03, 2017
12 12 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 03/03 11:51 AM
Motion Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.. (Ruffner, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order on Admission Pro Hac Vice
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Consent Fri 03/03 11:26 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Eleanor Vernon Ruffner for Defendant Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Ruffner, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/03 11:24 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc., (Ruffner, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
9 9 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 02/28 11:07 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/15 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Nicholas J. Reisch to Seek Default against Sierra Pine Resources International Inc. . Default Judgment Motion due by 3/15/2017 (Order entered on 2/13/2017)
Monday, February 13, 2017
7 7 order AP-Seek Default (F) Mon 02/13 9:56 AM
Order for Nicholas J. Reisch to Seek Default against Sierra Pine Resources International Inc. . Default Judgment Motion due by 3/15/2017 (Order entered on 2/13/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:52 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
4 4 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 9:57 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:07 PM
Summons Served on Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 4:46 PM
Summons Issued on Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 4:46 PM
Adversary case 17-01003 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet