Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:15-bk-10003
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 10, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 11, 2015
Terminated:Jun 05, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Sep 04, 2015

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WBH Energy, LP
4407 Bee Caves Rd Ste 421
West Lake Hills, TX 78746-6406
Represented By
Jason G. Cohen
Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP
contact info
Chelsea Rose Dal Corso
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
Michael De Voe Piazza
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Jennifer J. Hardy
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
William A. (Trey) Wood, III
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
Debtor
WBH Energy Partners LLC
4407 Bee Caves Road Suite 421
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Jason G. Cohen
Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP
contact info
Chelsea Rose Dal Corso
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
William A. (Trey) Wood, III
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
Debtor
WBH Energy GP, LLC
4407 Bee Caves Road Suite 421
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Jason G. Cohen
Bracewell & Giuliani, LLP
contact info
Chelsea Rose Dal Corso
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
William A. (Trey) Wood, III
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee
333 Clay, 29th Floor
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Wayne Kitchens
Hughes Watters Askanase, LLP
contact info
Timothy Aaron Million
Hughes Watters Askanase
contact info

GPO May 20 2016
Judge's Memorandum/Opinion (related document(s): 621 Objection to Claim of U.S. Energy Development Corp. Filed by Kenneth P. Green for Creditor CL III Funding Holding Company, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 5/20/2016) (Benitez, Estella)

1. Tiny Texas oil and gas producer files for bankruptcy protection (reuters.com)
Submitted Thu 01/08/2015
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Sunday, June 07, 2020
863 863 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/07 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 862 Order Granting Application for Final Decree (related document(s):860 Application for Final Decree (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Steven Shurn for Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 6/5/2020)
Friday, June 05, 2020
862 862 order BK-Final Decree (PDF) Fri 06/05 10:48 AM
Order Granting Application for Final Decree Related [+] (Order entered on 6/5/2020) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 860 Application for Final Decree (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Steven Shurn for Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/05 10:56 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]