Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01004
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Jan 11, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lewis Stuart, LP
705 8th Street, Suite 400
Wichita Falls, TX 76301
Represented By
Lewis Stuart, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Friday, January 11, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/11 10:08 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/07 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01004 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Lewis Stuart, LP (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 9/5/2018)
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
32 32 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Wed 09/05 4:06 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+] (Order entered on 9/5/2018) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01004 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Lewis Stuart, LP (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, June 09, 2018
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/09 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/09/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order Regarding (related document(s):29 Motion Third Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 6/7/2018)
Thursday, June 07, 2018
30 30 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 06/07 2:01 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 6/7/2018) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 29 Motion Third Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Thu 06/07 2:03 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 9/7/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/28/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 9/17/2018. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
29 29 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Wed 06/06 3:13 PM
Motion Third Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 11, 2018
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/11 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Regarding (related document(s):26 Second Agreed Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/9/2018)
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
27 27 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 01/09 9:34 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 1/9/2018) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 26 Second Agreed Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 01/09 9:39 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 8/1/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/7/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/25/2018 and Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2018 . (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 27 Order Regarding (related document(s):26 Second Agreed Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/9/2018)
Monday, January 08, 2018
26 26 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Mon 01/08 4:45 PM
Second Agreed Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/07 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Regarding (related document(s):23 Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 6/5/2017)
Monday, June 05, 2017
24 24 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 06/05 5:04 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 6/5/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 23 Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 06/05 5:06 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 3/7/2018 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 1/5/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 2/28/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/15/2018. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
23 23 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Wed 05/31 1:35 PM
Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, April 08, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Regarding (related document(s):16 Defendant's Motion to Stay (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 4/6/2017)
Friday, April 07, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01004 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Lewis Stuart, LP (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 9/6/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/5/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/30/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 4/5/2017)) Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.
Thursday, April 06, 2017
20 20 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 04/06 8:02 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/6/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 16 Defendant's Motion to Stay (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
19 19 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Wed 04/05 2:04 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01004 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Lewis Stuart, LP (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). Docket Call Set For 9/6/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/5/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/30/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 4/5/2017) (Farrar, Ronda
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
18 18 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 03/28 10:15 AM
Reply to Creditors' Trustee's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP (Johnson, Jeffery) Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Defendant's Motion to Stay (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
17 17 ans Response (Adversary) Tue 03/21 4:53 PM
Response Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Defendant's Motion to Stay (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
16 16 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 03/07 9:23 PM
Defendant's Motion to Stay (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Johnson, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 06, 2017
15 15 misc Jury Demand Mon 03/06 5:40 PM
Jury Demand filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP (Johnson, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/06 12:05 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Lewis Stuart, LP, (Johnson, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/25 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Allowing Extension of Time to March 7, 2017 (related document(s):8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time ANSWER DEADLINE, Filed by Jeffrey R. Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP.) (Order entered on 2/23/2017)
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/25 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Regarding (related document(s):9 Motion For Leave to make Paper Filing (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP.) (Order entered on 2/23/2017)
Thursday, February 23, 2017
11 11 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Thu 02/23 3:33 PM
Order Allowing Extension of Time to March 7, 2017 Related [+] (Order entered on 2/23/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time ANSWER DEADLINE, Filed by Jeffrey R. Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP.
10 10 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 02/23 3:29 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/23/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Leave to make Paper Filing (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP.
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Thu 02/23 3:34 PM
Lewis Stuart, LP's answer deadline updated to 3/7/2017 (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
9 9 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/23 10:55 AM
Motion For Leave to make Paper Filing (14 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jeffery R Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
8 8 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Wed 02/22 4:50 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time ANSWER DEADLINE, Filed by Jeffrey R. Johnson for Defendant Lewis Stuart, LP. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
7 7 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:51 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
6 6 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 01/25 2:43 PM
Summons Served on Lewis Stuart, LP - served on 1/20/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
5 5 court Request For Summons (Auto) Fri 01/20 1:25 PM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on Lewis Stuart, LP Answer Due 02/21/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
3 3 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 9:56 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:13 PM
Summons Issued on Lewis Stuart, LP Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:13 PM
Adversary case 17-01004 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Lewis Stuart, LP (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet