Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01007
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. Energy Development Corporation
815 Brazos Street, Suite 500
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
U.S. Energy Development Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Sunday, September 15, 2019
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/15 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 9/13/2019)
Friday, September 13, 2019
29 29 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Fri 09/13 8:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+] (Order entered on 9/13/2019) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/13 8:29 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/21 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/21/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Regarding (related document(s):26 Agreed Motion TO EXTEND TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 2/19/2019)
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
court Event (Public) Wed 02/20 1:21 PM
Court Public Entry: Pretrail Order Updated, Entered In Error Related [+] (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-] Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 8/16/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 9/25/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 8/29/2019. (Wallace, Adam) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
27 27 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 02/19 8:40 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/19/2019) (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-] 26 Agreed Motion TO EXTEND TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 02/19 8:46 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 8/16/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 9/25/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 8/29/2019. (Wallace, Adam) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, February 14, 2019
26 26 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/14 3:24 PM
Agreed Motion TO EXTEND TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 28, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/28 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Granting Second Agreed Motion To Extend Trial Docket Call and Related Matters (related document(s):23 Agreed Motion to Extend Time, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 6/26/2018)
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
24 24 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 06/26 8:54 AM
Order Granting Second Agreed Motion To Extend Trial Docket Call and Related Matters Related [+] (Order entered on 6/26/2018) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 23 Agreed Motion to Extend Time, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 06/26 8:57 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 1/18/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 2/27/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/31/2019. (Benitez, Estella) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Monday, June 25, 2018
23 23 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 06/25 3:30 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/07 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Allowing Extension of Time (related document(s):20 Agreed Motion to Extend Time Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) ,. (Order entered on 2/5/2018)
Monday, February 05, 2018
21 21 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Mon 02/05 10:21 AM
Order Allowing Extension of Time Related [+] ,. (Order entered on 2/5/2018) (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-] 20 Agreed Motion to Extend Time Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 02/05 10:16 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 8/1/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 6/15/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/25/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 6/29/2018. (Wallace, Adam) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, February 02, 2018
20 20 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 02/02 4:17 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines, Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, October 29, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/29 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Amended Order Granting Plaintiff Motion to Modify: (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation Docket Call Set For 07/03/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 03/15/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 06/27/2018 Dispositive Motions Due By 03/30/2018 . (Order entered on 10/27/2017)) Notice Date 10/29/2017. (Admin.
Friday, October 27, 2017
18 18 order AP-Amended Order (PDF) Fri 10/27 10:04 AM
Amended Order Granting Plaintiff Motion to Modify: Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation Docket Call Set For 07/03/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 03/15/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 06/27/2018 Dispositive Motions Due By 03/30/2018 . (Order entered on 10/27/2017) (Chapman, Anita
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Fri 10/27 10:06 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 7/3/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 3/15/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/27/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 3/30/2018. (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
17 17 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 10/26 4:57 PM
****DOCKETED IN ERROR***Amend Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation11 Modified Scheduling Order Regarding (related document(s):10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation.10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. Modified on 10/27/2017 (Chapman, Anita)
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
court Notice Regarding Telephonic Request Wed 10/25 8:27 AM
Judge's Notice of Party Permitted to Appear Telephonically Related [+]
Related: [-] Request for Telephonic Appearance (Reason: Mr. Reisch would like appear by telephone to avoid costs associated with travel, Phone: 713-2121-2644) (Date and Time of Hearing: 10/27/17 @ 1:30pm) filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian) ...CONFERENCE DIAL-IN NUMBER: 1-712-432-3066; CONFERENCE CODE NUMBER: 816944 ... FOR DETAILS REGARDING LIMITATIONS FOR A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PLEASE REVIEW THE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PROCEDURES ON JUDGE MOTT'S INFORMATION PAGE FOUND AT WWW.TXWB.USCOURTS.GOV (Farrar, Ronda
Monday, October 23, 2017
misc Request for Telephonic Appearance Mon 10/23 10:52 AM
Request for Telephonic Appearance Related [+] (Date and Time of Hearing: 10/27/17 @ 1:30pm) filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-] ason: Mr. Reisch would like appear by telephone to avoid costs associated with travel, Phone: 713-2121-264416 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian). Related document(s)1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: #1 Adversary Coversheet)
court Hearing (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 10/23 10:53 AM
STATUS Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Status Hearing Set For 10/27/2017 at 01:30 PM at Austin Courtroom 2 (Farrar, Ronda
Friday, September 29, 2017
16 16 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 09/29 5:32 PM
Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian). Related document(s)1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/17 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Regarding (related document(s):13 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):11 Modified Scheduling Order Regarding (related document(s):10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017))) (Order entered on 5/30/2017))) (Order entered on 8/15/2017)
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
14 14 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 08/15 7:21 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 8/15/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 13 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):11 Modified Scheduling Order Regarding (related document(s):10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017))) (Order entered on 5/30/2017))
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 08/15 7:24 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 2/7/2018 at 9:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 11/15/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/30/2017 . (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Monday, August 14, 2017
13 13 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Mon 08/14 1:25 PM
Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Taylor, Mark) Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Modified Scheduling Order Regarding (related document(s):10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017))) (Order entered on 5/30/2017)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 01, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Modified Scheduling Order Regarding (related document(s):10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017))) (Order entered on 5/30/2017)
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
11 11 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 05/30 9:05 AM
Modified Scheduling Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/30/2017) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 10 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Mark) (related document(s):8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017))
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 05/30 9:07 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 11/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 9/15/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 10/25/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/1/2017. (Benitez, Estella) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, May 26, 2017
10 10 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 05/26 2:24 PM
Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman, Mark Curtis Taylor for Plaintiff John D Mullen, Defendant U.S. Energy Development Corporation. (Taylor, Mark) Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 09, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/10 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017)
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
8 8 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Tue 02/07 10:31 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, February 03, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/03 1:46 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by U.S. Energy Development Corporation, (Taylor, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:50 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/10 4:34 PM
Summons Served on U.S. Energy Development Corporation - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 9:59 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:23 PM
Summons Issued on U.S. Energy Development Corporation Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:23 PM
Adversary case 17-01007 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against U.S. Energy Development Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet