Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01008
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Aug 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nottus Energy Resources, Inc.
900 Eighth Street, Suite 916
Wichita Falls, TX 76301
Represented By
Nottus Energy Resources, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Saturday, August 19, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01008 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 8/17/2017)
Thursday, August 17, 2017
15 15 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Thu 08/17 2:46 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+] (Order entered on 8/17/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01008 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
14 14 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 08/17 11:47 AM
Order of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/17 2:47 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/19 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Regarding (related document(s):11 Motion Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Abate Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 5/17/2017)
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
12 12 2 pgs order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 05/17 7:20 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/17/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 11 Motion Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Abate Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
11 11 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 05/16 2:30 PM
Motion Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Abate Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 09, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/10 12:45 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01008 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017)
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
9 9 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Tue 02/07 10:34 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/8/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/31/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/18/2017 . (Order entered on 2/7/2017) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01008 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, February 02, 2017
8 8 misc Statement Regarding Consent Thu 02/02 3:53 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by John A. Leonard for Defendant Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Leonard, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/02 3:52 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Nottus Energy Resources, Inc., (Leonard, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:50 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 01/11 10:28 AM
Summons Served on Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
3 3 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 10:00 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:26 PM
Summons Issued on Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:26 PM
Adversary case 17-01008 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Nottus Energy Resources, Inc. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet