Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01009
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Feb 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Warnock
2 Scott Crescent
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Joseph Warnock
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Warnock
2 Scott Crescent
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Jacob Warnock
contact info
Defendant
David Henderson
729 Wesley Ridge Drive
Spicewood, TX 78669
Represented By
David Henderson
contact info
Defendant
Randal Winfrey
2416 Brentwood Drive
Wichita Falls, TX 76308
Represented By
Randal Winfrey
contact info
Defendant
Ryen Burrus
3308 Jefferson Street
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Ryen Burrus
contact info
Defendant
Jexas Resources, LLC
2004 Berkley Drive
Wichita Falls, TX 76308
Represented By
Jexas Resources, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services
2004 Berkley Drive
Wichita Falls, TX 76308
Represented By
Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services
contact info
Defendant
WSJ Enterprises, Inc.
4407 Bee Caves Road Suite 421
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
WSJ Enterprises, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd.
2004 Berkley Drive
Wichita Falls, TX 76308
Represented By
JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Friday, February 01, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/01 4:21 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/11 2:15 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
court Case Reopened (Adversary) Tue 09/11 2:19 PM
Case Reopened. Reason: Closed in error (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 31 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Order entered on 2/20/2018)) Notice Date 02/22/2018. (Admin.
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
31 31 2 pgs order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Tue 02/20 10:05 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Order entered on 2/20/2018) (Chapman, Anita
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Regarding (related document(s):28 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .) (Order entered on 11/20/2017)
Monday, November 20, 2017
29 29 3 pgs order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 11/20 9:42 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 11/20/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 28 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 11/20 10:37 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 5/5/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/30/2018 and Dispositive Motions Due By 5/14/2018 . (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, November 17, 2017
28 28 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 11/17 6:07 PM
Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 13, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/13 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Regarding (related document(s):25 AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) (related document(s):19 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017))) (Order entered on 4/11/2017)
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
26 26 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 04/11 4:02 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/11/2017) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 25 AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) (related document(s):19 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017))
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Tue 04/11 4:05 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2 Discovery due 1/5/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/12/2018. (Benitez, Estella) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Monday, April 10, 2017
25 25 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 04/10 3:26 PM
AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DOCKET CALL AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, March 25, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/25 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order DISMISSING DEFENDANT RYEN BURRUS (related document(s):22 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) (related document(s):21 Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen)) (Order entered on 3/23/2017)
Thursday, March 23, 2017
23 23 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 03/23 9:25 AM
Order DISMISSING DEFENDANT RYEN BURRUS Related [+] (Order entered on 3/23/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) (related document(s):21 Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen)
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/21 5:32 PM
Amended Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 21 Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 09, 2017
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/09 3:57 PM
Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 04, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/04 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017)
Thursday, February 02, 2017
19 19 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 02/02 7:11 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
18 18 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 4:19 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Ryen Burrus, David Henderson, JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd., Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, Jexas Resources, LLC, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Warnock, Joseph Warnock, Randal Winfrey, Counter Claimants Ryen Burrus, David Henderson, JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd., Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, Jexas Resources, LLC, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Warnock, Joseph Warnock, Randal Winfrey (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/31 4:17 PM
Jury Demand filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Ryen Burrus, David Henderson, JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd., Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, Jexas Resources, LLC, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Warnock, Joseph Warnock, Randal Winfrey, Counter Claimants Ryen Burrus, David Henderson, JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd., Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, Jexas Resources, LLC, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Warnock, Joseph Warnock, Randal Winfrey (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 01/31 4:13 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against all plaintiffs filed by Ryen Burrus, David Henderson, JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd., Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, Jexas Resources, LLC, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Warnock, Joseph Warnock, Randal Winfrey, (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/31 2:49 PM
Summons Served on JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. - served on 1/31/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/31 2:46 PM
Summons Served on Jexas Resources, LLC - served on 1/31/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/31 2:45 PM
Summons Served on Jacob Warnock - served on 1/31/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/31 2:44 PM
Summons Served on Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services - served on 1/31/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:49 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
10 10 court Request For Summons (Auto) Wed 01/25 9:28 AM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. Answer Due 02/24/2017; Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services Answer Due 02/24/2017; Jexas Resources, LLC Answer Due 02/24/2017; Jacob Warnock Answer Due 02/24/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
9 9 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 01/13 3:57 PM
Reissued Summons Served on Ryen Burrus - served on 1/13/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
7 7 court Request For Summons (Auto) Thu 01/12 3:59 PM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on Ryen Burrus Answer Due 02/13/2017; David Henderson Answer Due 02/13/2017; JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. Answer Due 02/13/2017; Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services Answer Due 02/13/2017; Jexas Resources, LLC Answer Due 02/13/2017; Jacob Warnock Answer Due 02/13/2017; Randal Winfrey Answer Due 02/13/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
6 6 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 10:01 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
5 5 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:10 PM
Summons Served on Joseph Warnock - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:09 PM
Summons Served on WSJ Enterprises, Inc. - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:09 PM
Summons Served on David Henderson - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:34 PM
Summons Issued on Joseph Warnock Answer Due 02/3/2017; Jacob Warnock Answer Due 02/3/2017; David Henderson Answer Due 02/3/2017; Randal Winfrey Answer Due 02/3/2017; Ryen Burrus Answer Due 02/3/2017; Jexas Resources, LLC Answer Due 02/3/2017; Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services Answer Due 02/3/2017; WSJ Enterprises, Inc. Answer Due 02/3/2017; JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:34 PM
Adversary case 17-01009 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Joseph Warnock, Jacob Warnock, David Henderson, Randal Winfrey, Ryen Burrus, Jexas Resources, LLC, Jacob A. Warnock, Inc. a/k/a MR Land Services, WSJ Enterprises, Inc., JW Aircraft Services, Ltd. Co. a/k/a JW Services Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet