Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01010
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Jan 11, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rife Energy Operating, Inc.
3880 Hulen Street, Suite 510
Fort Worth, TX 76107
Represented By
Rife Energy Operating, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC
4407 Bee Caves Road, Suite 421
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Warnock
2 Scott Crescent
Austin, TX 78703
Represented By
Joseph Warnock
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, January 11, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/11 10:36 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/14 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Dismissing Claims against Creditor Trustee and Rife Energy Operating, Inc. (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 3/12/2018)
Monday, March 12, 2018
28 28 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Mon 03/12 3:19 PM
Order Dismissing Claims against Creditor Trustee and Rife Energy Operating, Inc. Related [+] (Order entered on 3/12/2018) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, February 22, 2018
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 26 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Order entered on 2/20/2018)) Notice Date 02/22/2018. (Admin.
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
26 26 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Tue 02/20 10:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Order entered on 2/20/2018) (Chapman, Anita
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Regarding (related document(s):23 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .) (Order entered on 11/20/2017)
Monday, November 20, 2017
24 24 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 11/20 9:42 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 11/20/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 23 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 11/20 10:35 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 4/30/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/30/2018 and Dispositive Motions Due By 5/9/2018 . (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, November 17, 2017
23 23 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 11/17 6:02 PM
Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 26, 2017
22 22 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 10/26 5:20 PM
Motion TO COMPROMISE WITH RIFE ENERGY OPERATING, INC. Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/24 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Modified Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))(Order entered on 5/22/2017)
Monday, May 22, 2017
20 20 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 05/22 10:45 AM
Modified Scheduling Order Related [+](Order entered on 5/22/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 05/22 10:49 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 12/29/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/9/2018 (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Zimmerman, Brian
Thursday, May 18, 2017
19 19 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 05/18 9:52 AM
Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock, Counter Claimants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 08, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Regarding (related document(s):14 Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)) (Order entered on 4/6/2017)
Thursday, April 06, 2017
17 17 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 04/06 8:02 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/6/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 14 Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
16 16 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 03/28 10:59 AM
Reply to Creditors' Trustee's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Casey, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
15 15 ans Response (Adversary) Tue 03/21 4:56 PM
Response Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
14 14 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 03/07 9:07 AM
Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay
Saturday, February 04, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/04 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017)
Thursday, February 02, 2017
12 12 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 02/02 7:15 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 4:54 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock, Counter Claimants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/31 4:53 PM
Jury Demand filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock, Counter Claimants Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Tue 01/31 4:51 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against John D Mullen filed by Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock, (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:49 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
6 6 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 01/10 4:43 PM
Summons Served on Rife Energy Operating, Inc. - served on 1/9/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 10:05 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:12 PM
Summons Served on Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:11 PM
Summons Served on Joseph Warnock - served on 1/6/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:38 PM
Summons Issued on Rife Energy Operating, Inc. Answer Due 02/3/2017; Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC Answer Due 02/3/2017; Joseph Warnock Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:37 PM
Adversary case 17-01010 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Rife Energy Operating, Inc., Barnett Combo Acquisition, LLC, Joseph Warnock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet