Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:17-ap-01012
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2017
Terminated:Sep 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aech Energy, Ltd.
4407 Bee Caves Road, Suite 421
Austin, TX 78746
Represented By
Aech Energy, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Mullen
Represented By
Brian W. Zimmerman
Zimmerman, Alelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info
Nicholas J. Reisch
Zimmerman, Axelrad, Meyer, Stern & Wise
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/11 2:20 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Dismissing Adversary Case (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 2/20/2018)
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
24 24 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Tue 02/20 10:15 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case Related [+] (Order entered on 2/20/2018) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Regarding (related document(s):21 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .) (Order entered on 11/20/2017)
Monday, November 20, 2017
22 22 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 11/20 9:42 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 11/20/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 21 Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 .
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 11/20 10:23 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 6/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 4/30/2018, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/30/2018 and Dispositive Motions Due By 5/9/2018 . (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, November 17, 2017
21 21 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 11/17 5:52 PM
Second Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket Call and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2017 (Wallace, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/24 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Modified Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 5/22/2017)
Monday, May 22, 2017
19 19 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 05/22 10:41 AM
Modified Scheduling Order Related [+] (Order entered on 5/22/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 05/22 10:43 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 12/29/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2018, Dispositive Motions Due By 1/9/2018 (Boyd, Laurie) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: #1 Adversary Coversheet) (Zimmerman, Brian
Thursday, May 18, 2017
18 18 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 05/18 9:59 AM
Agreed Motion Agreed Motion to Continue Trial Docket and Related Deadlines Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 08, 2017
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Regarding (related document(s):13 Motion Defendant's Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)) (Order entered on 4/6/2017)
Thursday, April 06, 2017
16 16 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 04/06 8:02 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/6/2017) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 13 Motion Defendant's Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
15 15 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 03/28 10:35 AM
Reply to Creditors' Trustee's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd. (Casey, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion Defendant's Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
14 14 ans Response (Adversary) Tue 03/21 4:57 PM
Response Filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen. (Zimmerman, Brian) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion Defendant's Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
13 13 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 03/07 8:48 AM
Motion Defendant's Motion to Stay Filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd.. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Stay
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay
Saturday, February 04, 2017
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/04 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/04/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017)
Thursday, February 02, 2017
11 11 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 02/02 7:18 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 8/2/2017 at 09:30 AM at Austin Courtroom 2, Discovery due 7/3/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/26/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 7/14/2017 . (Order entered on 2/2/2017) (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
10 10 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 5:43 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Jury Demand Tue 01/31 5:42 PM
Jury Demand filed by Brian P. Casey for Defendant Aech Energy, Ltd. (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/31 5:42 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Aech Energy, Ltd., (Casey, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 10:47 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Plaintiff John D Mullen (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 01/10 10:08 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/10/2017) (Chapman, Anita)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Mon 01/09 4:15 PM
Summons Served on Aech Energy, Ltd. - served on 1/9/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:54 PM
Summons Issued on Aech Energy, Ltd. Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 01/04 5:43 PM
Summons Issued on Aech Energy, Ltd. Answer Due 02/3/2017 (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/04 5:43 PM
Adversary case 17-01012 Complaint filed by John D Mullen (attorneys Nicholas J. Reisch, Brian W. Zimmerman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Aech Energy, Ltd. (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet