Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-51834

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:18-ap-05266
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2018
Terminated:Oct 11, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Olmos Equipment Inc.
3511 Broadway
San Antonio, TX 78209
Represented By
Olmos Equipment Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
333 S. Wabash Avenue
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Continental Casualty Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipelayers, Inc.
Represented By
William R. Davis, Jr
Langley & Banack, Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Saturday, October 19, 2019
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/19 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Amended Agreed Judgment (related document(s):30 Agreed Judgment (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 10/11/2019)) (Order entered on 10/17/2019)
Thursday, October 17, 2019
33 33 order AP-Amended Order (PDF) Thu 10/17 1:37 PM
Amended Agreed Judgment Related [+] (Order entered on 10/17/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 30 Agreed Judgment (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 10/11/2019)
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
32 32 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 10/15 2:31 PM
Motion to Amend Agreed Judgment filed by William R. Davis Jr for Plaintiff Pipelayers, Inc.(Davis, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 30 Agreed Judgment (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 10/11/2019)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, October 13, 2019
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/13 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Agreed Judgment (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 10/11/2019)
Friday, October 11, 2019
30 30 order AP-Judgment (PDF) Fri 10/11 11:26 AM
Agreed Judgment Related [+] (Order entered on 10/11/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/11 11:29 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
court Docket Call Held (Adversary) Thu 09/05 1:07 PM
Docket Call Held. ***AGREED*** . Order Due to be filed by: William Davis Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Order due by 9/17/2019 (Esquivel, Maria
Saturday, May 18, 2019
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/18 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Regarding (related document(s):26 Motion Seeking Leave To File In Paper Form Filed by Susan A. Bowen for Interested Party Bexar County.) (Order entered on 5/15/2019)
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
28 28 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 05/15 12:08 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/15/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 26 Motion Seeking Leave To File In Paper Form Filed by Susan A. Bowen for Interested Party Bexar County.
Thursday, May 02, 2019
27 27 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Fri 05/03 4:37 PM
Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Bexar County, (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 05/03 4:06 PM
Motion Seeking Leave To File In Paper Form Filed by Susan A. Bowen for Interested Party Bexar County. (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/11 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Striking (related document(s):23 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Bexar County,) (Order entered on 4/9/2019)
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
24 24 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 04/09 9:12 AM
Order Striking Related [+] (Order entered on 4/9/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 23 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Bexar County,
Friday, March 29, 2019
23 23 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Wed 04/03 8:09 AM
Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Bexar County, (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 03/25 10:01 AM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 9/3/2019 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 ***SET PER ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Sunday, March 24, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/24 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Allowing Motion to Amend Order; Discovery 7/22/2019; dispositive motions 8/1/2019; pretrial order 8/23/2019; docket call 9/3/2019 (related document(s):20 Joint Motion to Amend the Court's January 23rd, 2019, Scheduling Order filed by Sam Drugan, William B. Kingman for Creditor Frost Bank, Third Pty Plaintif Frost Bank, Defendant Olmos Equipment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kingman, William) (related document(s):12 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company))) (Order entered on 3/22/2019)
Friday, March 22, 2019
21 21 order BK-Allowing Motion to Amend Order (pdf) Fri 03/22 4:33 PM
Order Allowing Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Discovery 7/22/2019; dispositive motions 8/1/2019; pretrial order 8/23/2019; docket call 9/3/2019 Related [+] (Order entered on 3/22/2019) (Esquivel, Maria) Modified on 3/25/2019 (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 20 Joint Motion to Amend the Court's January 23rd, 2019, Scheduling Order filed by Sam Drugan, William B. Kingman for Creditor Frost Bank, Third Pty Plaintif Frost Bank, Defendant Olmos Equipment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kingman, William) (related document(s):12 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company))
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Fri 03/22 4:35 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due 7/22/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/23/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 8/1/2019. (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
20 20 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 03/21 5:08 PM
Joint Motion to Amend the Court's January 23rd, 2019, Scheduling Order filed by Sam Drugan, William B. Kingman for Creditor Frost Bank, Third Pty Plaintif Frost Bank, Defendant Olmos Equipment Inc. (Kingman, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
19 19 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 03/06 3:01 PM
Summons Served on County of Bexar, Texas - served on 3/4/2019 (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
18 18 court Request For Summons (Auto) Wed 02/27 12:34 PM
Summons Issued on County of Bexar, Texas Answer Due 03/29/2019 (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 02/27 12:26 PM
Third-Party Complaint against County of Bexar, Texas (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 24, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/24 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Regarding (related document(s):14 Motion of Frost Bank For Permissive Joinder Filed by Robert L. Barrows for Creditor Frost Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 2/22/2019)
Friday, February 22, 2019
15 15 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 02/22 12:56 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/22/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 14 Motion of Frost Bank For Permissive Joinder Filed by Robert L. Barrows for Creditor Frost Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Thursday, February 21, 2019
14 14 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/21 4:47 PM
Motion of Frost Bank For Permissive Joinder Filed by Robert L. Barrows for Creditor Frost Bank. (Barrows, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
13 13 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 01/23 12:35 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by William R. Davis Jr for Plaintiff Pipelayers, Inc. (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
12 12 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Wed 01/23 8:19 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 6/4/2019 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 4/23/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/28/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/3/2019. (Order entered on 1/23/2019) (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, January 19, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/19 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order for Pipelayers, Inc. to Seek Default against Continental Casualty Company . Default Judgment Motion due by 2/19/2019 (Order entered on 1/17/2019)
Friday, January 18, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/18 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/16/2019)
Thursday, January 17, 2019
9 9 ans Response (Adversary) Thu 01/17 2:12 PM
Original Answer to Complaint Filed by Richard Alan Fulton for Defendant Continental Casualty Company. (Fulton, Richard). Modified on 1/18/2019 (Hernandez, Rachel)
Related: [-]
8 8 order AP-Seek Default (F) Thu 01/17 9:29 AM
Order for Pipelayers, Inc. to Seek Default against Continental Casualty Company . Default Judgment Motion due by 2/19/2019 (Order entered on 1/17/2019) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
7 7 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 01/16 10:08 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by William B. Kingman for Defendant Olmos Equipment Inc. (Kingman, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Wed 01/16 8:16 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/16/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/15 4:25 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Olmos Equipment Inc., (Kingman, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Mon 01/14 5:14 PM
Olmos Equipment Inc. answer deadline updated to 1/15/2019 (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
4 4 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 01/11 10:05 AM
Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint filed by William B. Kingman for Defendant Olmos Equipment Inc. (Kingman, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 12/05 2:44 PM
Summons Served on Continental Casualty Company - served on 12/4/2018; Olmos Equipment Inc. - served on 12/4/2018 (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 12/04 2:21 PM
Summons Issued on Olmos Equipment Inc. Answer Due 01/3/2019; Continental Casualty Company Answer Due 01/3/2019 (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/04 2:21 PM
Adversary case 18-05266 Complaint filed by Pipelayers, Inc. (attorney William R. Davis Jr) against Olmos Equipment Inc., Continental Casualty Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Davis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet