Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-51834

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:19-ap-05060
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Godfrey Construction Company
4611 Locksford Drive
Bryan, TX 77802
Represented By
Godfrey Construction Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.
Warren, Drugan & Barrows, P.C. 800 Broadway
San Antonio, TX 78215
Represented By
Sam Drugan
Warren, Drugan & Barrows, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Wed 04/15 3:44 PM
Hearing Held: ***MOOT - ADVERSARY CASE DISMISSED ON 4/3/20*** . . Related [+]) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 12 Motion For Leave of Court to File Late Filed Answer Filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/15 4:13 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Mooting (related document(s):12 Motion For Leave of Court to File Late Filed Answer Filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 4/6/2020)
Monday, April 06, 2020
16 16 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 04/06 12:48 PM
Order Mooting Related [+] (Order entered on 4/6/2020) (Hernandez, Rachel)
Related: [-] 12 Motion For Leave of Court to File Late Filed Answer Filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Friday, April 03, 2020
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/03 2:56 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (Drugan, Sam) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-05060 Complaint filed by Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (attorney Sam Drugan) against Godfrey Construction Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))).
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
14 14 court TELEPHONIC HEARING (FORM) (Adversary) - CAG Tue 03/31 2:41 PM
TELEPHONIC Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: DIAL IN INFORMATION IS AS FOLLOWS: (877) 336-1831 Access Code 5045963 - IF AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING IS REQUIRED PLEASE CONTACT LISA ELIZONDO AT lisa_elizondo@txwb.uscourts.gov Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 4/15/2020 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 12 Motion For Leave of Court to File Late Filed Answer Filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Friday, March 27, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/27 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default against Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.
Thursday, March 26, 2020
12 12 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 03/26 4:26 PM
Motion For Leave of Court to File Late Filed Answer Filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc.. (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 answer Answer to Counterclaim(mapping) Thu 03/26 4:24 PM
Answer to Counterclaim filed by Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc., (Drugan, Sam) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. filed by Godfrey Construction Company,
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Wed 03/25 3:28 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (Kanyumbu, Terrance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
9 9 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 03/24 11:44 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to FROST BANK, ASSIGNEE OF OLMOS EQUIPMENT, INC. filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Counter Claimant Godfrey Construction Company (Battaglia, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ray Battaglia
Thursday, January 09, 2020
8 8 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 01/09 7:10 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 5/26/2020 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 4/8/2020, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/19/2020, Dispositive Motions Due By 4/20/2020. (Order entered on 1/9/2020) (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint () filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (Drugan, Sam) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 19-05060 Complaint filed by Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (attorney Sam Drugan) against Godfrey Construction Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))).)
Monday, January 06, 2020
7 7 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Mon 01/06 11:14 AM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. filed by Godfrey Construction Company, (Battaglia, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
6 6 order AP-Seek Default (F) Thu 12/12 11:07 AM
Order for Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. to Seek Default against Godfrey Construction Company . Default Judgment Motion due by 1/13/2020 (Order entered on 12/12/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
5 5 cmp Adversary Summons Served Thu 12/05 5:08 PM
Summons Served on Godfrey Construction Company - served on 11/26/2019 (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Thu 12/05 3:07 PM
Summons Served on Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. - served on 11/26/2019 (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
3 3 misc Amended Complaint Tue 11/19 4:04 PM
Amended Complaint () filed by Sam Drugan for Plaintiff Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (Drugan, Sam) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-05060 Complaint filed by Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (attorney Sam Drugan) against Godfrey Construction Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))).
Monday, October 21, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 10/21 2:54 PM
Summons Issued on Godfrey Construction Company Answer Due 11/20/2019 (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/21 2:54 PM
Adversary case 19-05060 Complaint filed by Frost Bank, Assignee of Olmos Equipment, Inc. (attorney Sam Drugan) against Godfrey Construction Company (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Drugan, Sam)
Related: [-]