PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
Drew Anthony Crossland
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #:
5:20-bk-51430
Case Filed:
Aug 11, 2020
Docket
Parties
Related Cases (5)
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Adversary
5:20-ap-05077 - Crossland v. Crossland
12/18/2020
Adversary
5:21-ap-05026 - Lowe et al v. Shuler
03/26/2021
Adversary
5:21-ap-05112 - Lowe, Trustee v. Internal Revenue Service of the United States of A
10/15/2021
Adversary
5:22-ap-05103 - Lowe, Trustee v. Crossland
12/23/2022
Adversary
5:23-ap-05030 - Lowe, Trustee v. Crossland
02/28/2023
Create an account to get the full docket for this case.
Continue to Create Account