Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-51430

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:20-ap-05077
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2020
Terminated:Sep 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Drew Anthony Crossland, Defendant
PO Box 1899
San Antonio, TX 78297
Represented By
Drew Anthony Crossland
contact info
Plaintiff
Evelin Crossland, Plaintiff
Attn: Thomas Rice/Eric A. Pullen 2161 NW Military Hwy., Ste 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Thomas Rice
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Eric A. Pullen
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
court Trial Held (Adversary) Tue 09/27 12:00 PM
Trial Hearing Held. ***JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/26/22*** . (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/27 3:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/26 11:13 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eric A. Pullen for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland, Plaintiff Evelin Crossland (Pullen, Eric) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
court Trial (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 07/05 1:45 PM
TRIAL to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Trial Hearing Set For 9/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***SET FROM DOCKET CALL HELD ON 7/5/22-NFN*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Friday, June 10, 2022
35 35 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 06/10 3:11 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Carissa N. Brewster as Counsel filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland (Pullen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/04 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Regarding (related document(s):32 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Baumer, Michael) Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. Modified on 5/2/2022 .) (Order entered on 5/2/2022)
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 05/03 7:00 AM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 7/5/2022 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 **8SET PER ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Monday, May 02, 2022
33 33 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 05/02 8:56 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 5/2/2022) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 32 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Baumer, Michael) Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. Modified on 5/2/2022 .
Thursday, April 28, 2022
32 32 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Thu 04/28 10:21 AM
Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Baumer, Michael) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 5/2/2022 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***SET PER ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES***
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 10, 2022
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/10 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order Regarding (related document(s):29 Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland.(related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.)) (Order entered on 2/8/2022)
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Thu 02/10 7:37 AM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 5/2/2022 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***SET PER ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
30 30 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 02/08 3:42 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/8/2022) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland.(related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.)
Monday, February 07, 2022
29 29 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Mon 02/07 7:31 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 02/08 3:34 PM
Hearing Held: ***MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED ON 2/7/2022*** . . Related [+] (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 12/07 7:25 AM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 2/7/2022 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***RESET FROM DOCKET HELD ON 12/6/21-NFN*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Thursday, July 22, 2021
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Thu 07/22 8:04 AM
DOCKET CALL CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 12/6/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***PER ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/21 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] (Order entered on 4/14/2021)) (Order entered on 7/19/2021)) Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Second Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/21 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]) (Order entered on 7/19/2021)) Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Regarding (related document(s):23 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).) (Order entered on 4/14/2021))
Monday, July 19, 2021
26 26 order AP-Allowing Motion to Amend Order (PDF) Mon 07/19 2:26 PM
Second Amended Scheduling Order Related [+].) (Order entered on 4/14/2021)) (Order entered on 7/19/2021) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
25 25 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 07/19 7:55 AM
Order Regarding Related [+])) (Order entered on 7/19/2021) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 23 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).) (Order entered on 4/14/2021)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Mon 07/19 2:29 PM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 12/6/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 10/17/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/29/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/31/2021. (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Mon 07/19 2:35 PM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED*** . . Related [+] (Order entered on 4/14/2021))) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).
Friday, July 16, 2021
24 24 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 07/16 2:27 PM
Expedited Notice of Expedited Telephonic Hearing filed by Carissa Brewster for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland (Brewster, Carissa) Related [+] (Order entered on 4/14/2021)
Related: [-] 22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).
23 23 motion Expedite Hearing (Adversary) Fri 07/16 11:32 AM
Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) Related [+] (Order entered on 4/14/2021)
Related: [-] 22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)) ).
22 22 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Fri 07/16 11:23 AM
Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) Related [+].) (Order entered on 4/14/2021)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
court Telephonic Hearing (NO FORM) (Adversary) - CAG Fri 07/16 2:43 PM
TELEPHONIC EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: DIAL IN INFORMATION IS AS FOLLOWS: (650) 479-3207 Access Code 160-591-1937 - IF AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING IS REQUIRED PLEASE CONTACT LISA ELIZONDO AT lisa_elizondo@txwb.uscourts.gov Related [+]
Related: [-] 22 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) Hearing Scheduled For 7/19/2021 at 09:00 AM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***Eric A. Pullen Shall Give Notice of Hearing*** (Gonzalez, Rosa
Friday, April 16, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/16 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+].) (Order entered on 4/14/2021)) Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
Thursday, April 15, 2021
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Thu 04/15 8:12 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Docket Call Set For 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 7/19/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/16/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 8/2/2021. (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Thu 04/15 11:59 AM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***SET PER ORDER GRANTING TO MOTION TO AMEND*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
20 20 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 04/14 3:59 PM
Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] ).) (Order entered on 4/14/2021) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)
Monday, April 12, 2021
court Hearing Held Mon 04/12 2:37 PM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED*** . Order Due to be filed by Eric Pullen. Related [+] Order due by 4/26/2021 (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
Friday, April 09, 2021
19 19 ans Response (Adversary) Fri 04/09 11:01 AM
Response Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Baumer, Michael) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/07 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Regarding (related document(s):14 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)))) (Order entered on 4/5/2021)
17 17 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 04/07 11:33 AM
Plaintiff Evelin Crossland Witness and Exhibit List for April 12, 2021 Hearing filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland (Pullen, Eric) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
court Hearing Telephonic (NO FORM) CAG Tue 04/06 8:15 AM
EXPEDITED TELEPHONIC Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: DIAL IN INFORMATION IS AS FOLLOWS: (650) 479-3207 Access Code 160-591-1937 (1) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES; (2) IF EXHIBITS WILL BE OFFERED PLEASE CONTACT LISA ELIZONDO AT lisa_elizondo@txwb.uscourts.gov Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend SCHEDULING Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) Hearing Scheduled For 4/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 ***ERIC PULLEN SHALL GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING*** (Elizondo, Lisa
Monday, April 05, 2021
16 16 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 04/05 2:52 PM
Notice of Expedited Hearing on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland (Pullen, Eric) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)),15 Order Regarding (related document(s):14 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)))) (Order entered on 4/5/2021)
15 15 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 04/05 2:46 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/5/2021) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 14 Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)))
Thursday, April 01, 2021
14 14 motion Expedite Hearing (Adversary) Thu 04/01 2:44 PM
Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) (related document(s):7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021))
13 13 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 04/01 2:43 PM
Motion to Amend Order Filed by Eric A. Pullen for Plaintiff Evelin Crossland. (Pullen, Eric) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020.) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)
Friday, March 12, 2021
12 12 misc Statement Regarding Consent Fri 03/12 4:45 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland (Baumer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/25 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Extension of Time, Date Extended to 2/1/2021 (related document(s):3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Answer Complaint, Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) ,. (Order entered on 2/23/2021)
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
10 10 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Tue 02/23 11:02 AM
Order Granting Extension of Time, Date Extended to 2/1/2021 Related [+] ,. (Order entered on 2/23/2021) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Answer Complaint, Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Tue 02/23 11:03 AM
Drew Anthony Crossland answer deadline updated to 2/1/2021 (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 02/23 11:50 AM
Hearing Held: ***ORDER SIGNED ON 2/23/21 AT 9:02AM*** . . Related [+] (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Answer Complaint, Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Saturday, February 06, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/06 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .) Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021)
Thursday, February 04, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/04 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/2/2021)
7 7 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 02/04 9:48 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 Discovery due 5/5/2021, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/1/2021, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/17/2021. (Order entered on 2/4/2021) (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 .
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
6 6 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 02/02 4:03 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/2/2021) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/01 4:30 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Drew Anthony Crossland, (Baumer, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 court TELEPHONIC HEARING (FORM) (Adversary) - CAG Mon 02/01 9:20 AM
TELEPHONIC Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: DIAL IN INFORMATION IS AS FOLLOWS: (650) 479-3207 Access Code 160-591-1937 - IF AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING IS REQUIRED PLEASE CONTACT LISA ELIZONDO AT lisa_elizondo@txwb.uscourts.gov Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 2/23/2021 at 01:30 PM at VIA TELEPHONE-Conference Dial-In Number: (650)479-3207; Access Code: 160-591-1937 (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 3 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Answer Complaint, Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
3 3 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Wed 01/20 2:11 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Answer Complaint, Filed by Michael V. Baumer for Defendant Drew Anthony Crossland. (Baumer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 18, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 12/18 3:02 PM
Summons Issued on Drew Anthony Crossland Answer Due 01/19/2021 (Pullen, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/18 3:01 PM
Adversary case 20-05077 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 523 filed by Evelin Crossland (attorneys Thomas Rice, Eric A. Pullen) against Drew Anthony Crossland (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(66 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(1),(14),(14A) priority tax claims))). (Pullen, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2020 (Hernandez, Rachel)
Related: [-]