Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05085
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paul Burke, Defendant
Represented By
Paul Burke
contact info
Defendant
Bradford Farrar, Defendant
Represented By
Bradford Farrar
contact info
Defendant
Jacquelin Farrar, Defendant
Represented By
Jacquelin Farrar
contact info
Defendant
Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Plaintiff
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
William Drew Mallender
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 04, 2024
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Mon 03/04 8:56 AM
Hearing Held: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT SIGNED AND ENTERED IN BK 21-51523 ON 02/27/2024 (#321); STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 02/29/2024 (#35) -- ADVERSARY CLOSED Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Hardage, Bridget
Friday, March 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/01 8:09 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/29 4:42 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))).
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/07 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 32 Order Regarding (related document(s):31 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. )) (Order entered on 2/5/2024)) Notice Date 02/07/2024. (Admin.
Monday, February 05, 2024
33 33 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 02/05 11:14 AM
Notice of Continued Docket Call to March 4, 2024 @ 2pm filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 3/4/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER AGREED ORDER CONTINUING DOCKET CALL - RESET FROM 2/5/2024 - NO MS. MACFARLANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
32 32 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 02/05 9:54 AM
Order Regarding Related [+]
Related: [-] 31 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. )) (Order entered on 2/5/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 02/05 9:42 AM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 3/4/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER AGREED ORDER CONTINUING DOCKET CALL - RESET FROM 2/5/2024 - NO MS. MACFARLANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Friday, February 02, 2024
31 31 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Fri 02/02 5:05 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Monday, December 04, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 12/04 2:42 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):28 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):23 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):22 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))) Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023)
Monday, August 21, 2023
29 29 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Mon 08/21 11:59 AM
Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 28 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):23 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):22 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))
Saturday, August 19, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Sat 08/19 11:28 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER GRANTING AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 9/5/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Thursday, August 17, 2023
28 28 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 08/17 3:38 PM
Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):22 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Friday, July 14, 2023
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/14 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 AGREED Order Granting (related document(s):25 Agreed Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.) (Order entered on 7/12/2023) (Paez, Daniel) Modified on 7/12/2023 .
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
26 26 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 07/12 8:19 AM
AGREED Order Granting Related [+] (Order entered on 7/12/2023) (Paez, Daniel) Modified on 7/12/2023 (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 25 Agreed Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
25 25 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 07/11 1:42 PM
Agreed Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/21 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):22 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
23 23 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Wed 04/19 11:34 AM
Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-] 22 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC))
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 04/18 3:57 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call Set For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 6/12/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Monday, April 17, 2023
22 22 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Mon 04/17 4:26 PM
Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call set for 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 5/3/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2023. (Order entered on 2/2/2023)
Friday, February 24, 2023
21 21 misc Statement Regarding Consent Fri 02/24 10:56 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
20 20 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 02/08 5:04 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 05, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/05 11:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Regarding (related document(s):12 Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 2/3/2023)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/05 11:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/3/2023)
Saturday, February 04, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/04 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Regarding (related document(s):8 Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 2/2/2023)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/04 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call set for 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 5/3/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2023. (Order entered on 2/2/2023)) Notice Date 02/04/2023. (Admin.
Friday, February 03, 2023
15 15 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Fri 02/03 9:44 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 2/3/2023) (Mujica, Roxanne)
Related: [-]
14 14 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 02/03 9:23 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/3/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Thursday, February 02, 2023
13 13 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 02/02 3:13 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 2/2/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
12 12 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/02 2:27 PM
Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Notice Withdrawal of Document (Adversary) Thu 02/02 2:25 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Carothers, Patrick) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
10 10 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 02/02 11:37 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. Docket Call set for 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 5/3/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/15/2023. (Order entered on 2/2/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/02 8:29 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC, (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/02 8:19 AM
Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/02 8:09 AM
Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Tue 01/24 12:50 PM
Paul Burke answer deadline updated to 2/3/2023; Bradford Farrar answer deadline updated to 2/3/2023; Jacquelin Farrar answer deadline updated to 2/3/2023 (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
6 6 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 01/23 10:10 AM
Second Agreed Stipulation Between Plaintiff Trustee and Individual Defendants Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin Farrar to Extend Answer Deadline to February 3, 2023 filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))).,5 CORRECTED Agreed Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline for Defendants Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin Farrar filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, Between Plaintiff Trustee and Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))).) Modified on 1/12/2023.)
Thursday, January 12, 2023
5 5 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 01/12 1:40 PM
CORRECTED Agreed Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline for Defendants Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin Farrar filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, Between Plaintiff Trustee and Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))).) Modified on 1/12/2023.
court Update Answer Due Date (Adversary) Mon 01/23 1:23 PM
Paul Burke answer deadline updated to 1/20/2023; Bradford Farrar answer deadline updated to 1/20/2023; Jacquelin Farrar answer deadline updated to 1/20/2023 (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
4 4 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 01/11 12:06 PM
Agreed Stipulation Regarding Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint, Between Plaintiff Trustee and Paul David Burke, Bradford Farrar and Jacquelin filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))).
Friday, December 16, 2022
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 12/16 5:02 PM
Summons Served on Paul Burke - served on 12/8/2022; Bradford Farrar - served on 12/8/2022; Jacquelin Farrar - served on 12/8/2022; Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC - served on 12/8/2022 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 12/07 9:03 PM
Summons Issued on Paul Burke Answer Due 01/6/2023; Bradford Farrar Answer Due 01/6/2023; Jacquelin Farrar Answer Due 01/6/2023; Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC Answer Due 01/6/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 9:03 PM
Adversary case 22-05085 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Paul Burke, Bradford Farrar, Jacquelin Farrar, Financial Horizon Concepts, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]