Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:21-bk-51523
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Jan 13, 2022
Claims Deadline:Mar 22, 2022

Debtor
deeproot Capital Management, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249-3447
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
Policy Services, Inc.
12621 Silicon Dr.
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
Wizard Mode Media, LLC
12227 S Business Park Dr, Suite 130
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot Pinball, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr.
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot Growth Runs Deep Fund, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot 575 Fund, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot 3 Year Bonus Income Fund, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot BonusGrowth 5 Year Debenture Fund, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot Tech, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot Funds, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Debtor
deeproot Studios, LLC
12621 Silicon Dr
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
Catherine A. Curtis
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jason M. Rudd
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
John Patrick Lowe
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Adam Nach
Lane & Nach, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:02 PM CDT
Thursday, December 09, 2021
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Thu 12/09 7:01 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 21-51523 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A22684163 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Thu 12/09 7:00 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) without Schedules, without Statements (Filing Fee: $338.00) filed by deeproot Capital Management, LLC - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 12/16/2021 (Curtis, Catherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 12/09 7:02 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Catherine A. Curtis for Debtor deeproot Capital Management, LLC (Curtis, Catherine)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) without Schedules, without Statements (Filing Fee: $338.00) filed by deeproot Capital Management, LLC - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 12/16/2021
3 3 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Thu 12/09 11:46 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/13/2022 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (877)937-4915; Code: 7491951#. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]