Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05089
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Azar Parchami, Defendant
Represented By
Azar Parchami
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Plaintiff
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
William Drew Mallender
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/09 10:01 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/08 10:01 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Defendant Azar Parchami (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Azar Parchami (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))).
Monday, June 12, 2023
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 06/13 10:37 AM
Hearing Held: ***ADVISORY REGARDING SETTLEMENT FILED 6/5/2023*** . Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Tue 06/06 11:54 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 6/12/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee against Azar Parchami. (Castleberry, Deanna
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 06/06 11:18 AM
Request for Webex Appearanc Related [+] (Date and Time of Hearing: 6/12/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-] ason: The trustee, the Plaintiff, requests permission to appear by webex only to observe the docket call in the settled proceeding., Phone: 830-407-51151 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Azar Parchami (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))).
Monday, June 05, 2023
9 9 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 06/05 4:43 PM
Plaintiff's Advisory to the Court Regarding Settlement filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/21 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Azar Parchami. Docket Call Set For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/18/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 4/28/2023. (Order entered on 1/18/2023)) Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.
Friday, January 20, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/20 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/20/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/18/2023)
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
6 6 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Wed 01/18 7:34 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Azar Parchami. Docket Call Set For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/18/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 4/28/2023. (Order entered on 1/18/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Wed 01/18 3:40 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/18/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/18 10:45 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Azar Parchami, (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 12/16 5:05 PM
Summons Served on Azar Parchami - served on 12/8/2022 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 12/07 9:31 PM
Summons Issued on Azar Parchami Answer Due 01/6/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 9:31 PM
Adversary case 22-05089 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Azar Parchami (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]