Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05090
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pamela Hopman, Defendant
Represented By
Pamela Hopman
contact info
Defendant
PGH Advisors, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
PGH Advisors, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MP Wealth Management, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
MP Wealth Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
The Hopman Group, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
The Hopman Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MaRico Tippett, Defendant
Represented By
MaRico Tippett
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Plaintiff
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
William Drew Mallender
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 17, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/17 7:56 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
67 67 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/16 3:55 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 7041 of the FRBP filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Pamela Hopman, Paul Hopman, The Hopman Family Trust, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 31 First Amended Complaint (Amending to Add Party: Paul Hopman, The Hopman Family Trust, CWB Investment Advisors, LLC) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Pamela Hopman, PGH Advisors, LLC, MP Wealth Management, LLC, The Hopman Group, LLC, MaRico Tippett (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))).) Modified on 2/13/2023.,65 Final Default Judgment Against PGH Advisors, LLC and MP Wealth Management, LLC (related document(s):64 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendants PGH Advisors, LLC and MP Wealth Management, LLC [pursuant to Dkt. 61 - Clerk Entry of Default] Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):41 Order for John Patrick Lowe, Trustee to Seek Default against CWB Investment Advisors, LLC. Default Judgment Motion due by 4/14/2023 (Order entered on 3/15/2023))) (Order entered on 4/15/2024