Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05093
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hollie Gandy, Defendant
Represented By
Hollie Gandy
contact info
Defendant
Safe Money Solutions, Defendant
Represented By
Safe Money Solutions
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Plaintiff
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
William Drew Mallender
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 04, 2024
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Mon 03/04 9:26 AM
Hearing Held: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT SIGNED AND ENTERED IN BK 21-51523 ON 02/27/2024 (#321); STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 02/29/2024 (#40) -- ADVERSARY CLOSED Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions (Hardage, Bridget
Friday, March 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/01 8:12 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/29 4:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))).,4 First Amended Complaint (Amending to Add Party: Hollie Gandy-Donohue) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))))
Thursday, February 15, 2024
39 39 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 02/15 2:25 PM
DESTROYING Exhibits - NO Response filed by due date of 2/14/2024 by Mr. Pulman Related [+] Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing Held on 9/5/23 (Paez, Daniel) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] ument32 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/07 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 36 Order Regarding (related document(s):35 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. , 34 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. ))) (Order entered on 2/5/2024)) Notice Date 02/07/2024. (Admin.
Monday, February 05, 2024
37 37 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 02/05 11:20 AM
Notice of Continued Docket Call to March 4, 2024 @ 2pm filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 3/4/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER AGREED ORDER CONTINUING DOCKET CALL - RESET FROM 2/5/2024 - NO MS. MACFARLANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
36 36 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Mon 02/05 9:54 AM
Order Regarding Related [+]
Related: [-] 35 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. ,34 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. ))) (Order entered on 2/5/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 02/05 9:47 AM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 3/4/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER AGREED ORDER CONTINUING DOCKET CALL - RESET FROM 2/5/2024 - NO MS. MACFARLANE SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Friday, February 02, 2024
35 35 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Fri 02/02 5:29 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. ,34 Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s): Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. )
34 34 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Fri 02/02 5:12 PM
PDF IS PROPOSED ORDER.....Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***. ) Modified on 2/5/2024 (Hardage, Bridget)
Monday, December 04, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 12/04 2:48 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 2/5/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/4/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Friday, September 08, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/08 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order Regarding (related document(s):23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.) (Order entered on 9/6/2023)
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
31 31 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 09/06 10:29 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 9/6/2023) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
32 32 court Exhibit Index and Witness List (Adversary) Wed 09/06 12:44 PM
Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing Held on 9/5/23 Related [+] (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 01/16 5:21 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED - Order to come from Randy Pulman***. Related [+] (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Thursday, August 31, 2023
30 30 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 08/31 3:42 PM
Trustee's Witness and Exhibit List for September 5, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21-Day Objection Language) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Wed 08/30 8:18 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 9/05/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+] (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Wed 08/30 7:29 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: The trustee requests permission to appear by webex merely to observe the hearing., Reason: To save the time and expense of travel., Phone: 830-407-5115) (Date and Time of Hearing: 9/5/2023 at 2PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 08/29 7:43 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: Webex Appearance by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Reason: To avoid additional travel costs for limited hearing as counsel is a resident of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Phone: 412-414-6996) (Date and Time of Hearing: September 5, 2023) filed by Gregory W Hauswirth for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions (Hauswirth, Gregory) Related [+] Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing (Related Document(s):25 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) (related document(s):23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe,Trustee.) Hearing Scheduled For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1.
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Tue 08/29 8:09 AM
Judge's Notice, Gregory W. Hauswirth Permitting Appearance at hearing on 09/05/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+](Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):27 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):21 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))) Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023)
Monday, August 21, 2023
28 28 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Mon 08/21 12:12 PM
Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 27 Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):21 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))
Saturday, August 19, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Sat 08/19 11:34 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER GRANTING AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 9/5/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Thursday, August 17, 2023
27 27 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 08/17 3:44 PM
Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 21 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Friday, August 04, 2023
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/04 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe,Trustee.
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
25 25 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Wed 08/02 11:42 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe,Trustee.
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
24 24 answer Objection (Adversary) Tue 08/01 9:41 PM
Defendants' Omnibus Objection Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Hauswirth, Gregory) Related [+]
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee.
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
23 23 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 07/11 1:57 PM
Motion to Strike Defendants' Jury Demands (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/21 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
21 21 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Wed 04/19 11:51 AM
Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-] 20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (related document(s):16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions))
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 04/18 4:02 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 6/12/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Monday, April 17, 2023
20 20 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Mon 04/17 4:30 PM
Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/24/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/3/2023. (Order entered on 1/23/2023)
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
19 19 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 02/08 5:05 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
18 18 misc Statement Regarding Consent Tue 01/31 7:29 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/25 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/24/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/3/2023. (Order entered on 1/23/2023)) Notice Date 01/25/2023. (Admin.
Monday, January 23, 2023
16 16 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 01/23 3:07 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions. Docket Call Set For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 4/24/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 6/5/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/3/2023. (Order entered on 1/23/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
Saturday, January 21, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/21 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding (related document(s):8 Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/19/2023)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/21 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Regarding (related document(s):7 Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/19/2023)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/21 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/19/2023)
Thursday, January 19, 2023
12 12 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Thu 01/19 12:35 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 1/19/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
11 11 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 01/19 7:37 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 1/19/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
10 10 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 01/19 7:35 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 1/19/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/18 9:18 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions, (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Wed 01/18 9:16 AM
Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Gregory W. Hauswirth Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Wed 01/18 9:13 AM
Motion for Admission pro hac vice Filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendants Hollie Gandy, Hollie Gandy-Donohue, Safe Money Solutions. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 22, 2022
6 6 cmp Adversary Summons Served Thu 12/22 4:20 PM
Summons Served on Hollie Gandy-Donahue - served on 12/22/2022; Safe Money Solutions - served on 12/22/2022 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Request For Summons (Auto) Thu 12/22 3:44 PM
Summons Issued on Hollie Gandy-Donahue Answer Due 01/23/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Amended Complaint Thu 12/22 3:36 PM
Amended Complaint (Amending to Add Party: Hollie Gandy-Donahue) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))).
Friday, December 16, 2022
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 12/16 5:07 PM
Summons Served on Hollie Gandy - served on 12/8/2022; Safe Money Solutions - served on 12/8/2022 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 12/07 9:50 PM
Summons Issued on Hollie Gandy Answer Due 01/6/2023; Safe Money Solutions Answer Due 01/6/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 9:50 PM
Adversary case 22-05093 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Hollie Gandy, Safe Money Solutions (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]