Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:22-ap-05094
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2022
Terminated:Apr 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
George Michael Villa, Defendant
Represented By
George Michael Villa
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee, Plaintiff
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
William Drew Mallender
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
20 20 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 02/15 1:43 PM
DESTROYING Exhibits - NO Response filed by due date of 2/13/2024 by Mr. Pulman Related [+] Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on 4/10/2023 (Gonzalez, Rosa) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] ument18 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))
Friday, April 28, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/28 5:49 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/13 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Final Default Judgment against George Michael Villa (related document(s):9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))) (Order entered on 4/11/2023)
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order AP-Default Judgment (PDF) Tue 04/11 10:17 AM
Final Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Related [+] (Order entered on 4/11/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))
Monday, April 10, 2023
18 18 court Exhibit Index and Witness List Wed 04/12 11:08 AM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on 4/10/2023 Related [+] (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Wed 04/12 2:17 PM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED-REMOVE PREJUDGMENT RATE AND ADD NEW RATE AS OF TODAY ORDER SIGNED*** . . Related [+] (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))
Saturday, April 08, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/08 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Regarding (related document(s):12 Ex Parte Motion to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023),9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023)))) (Order entered on 4/6/2023)
Thursday, April 06, 2023
15 15 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 04/06 11:08 AM
Notice of Reset Hearing - as to TIME ONLY - on Plaintiff Motion for Default Judgment filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] Hearing RESET AS TO TIME ONLY ( 1.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON CONTACT THE COURTROOM DEPUTY, DEANNA CASTLEBERRY BY TELEPHONE (210) 472-6720 EXT. 5735 OR BY E-MAIL AT deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov to APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE OR WEBEX. (2.) IF YOU HAVE WITNESSES OR EXHIBITS YOU MUST APPEAR IN PERSON OR, IF GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT, BY WEBEX. (3.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 4/10/2023 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET AS TO TIME ONLY - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE***.
14 14 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Thu 04/06 9:27 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/6/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 12 Ex Parte Motion to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023),9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023)))
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary) Thu 04/06 9:31 AM
Hearing RESET AS TO TIME ONLY ( 1.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON CONTACT THE COURTROOM DEPUTY, DEANNA CASTLEBERRY BY TELEPHONE (210) 472-6720 EXT. 5735 OR BY E-MAIL AT deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov to APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE OR WEBEX. (2.) IF YOU HAVE WITNESSES OR EXHIBITS YOU MUST APPEAR IN PERSON OR, IF GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT, BY WEBEX. (3.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 4/10/2023 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET AS TO TIME ONLY - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE***.
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
13 13 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 04/05 5:16 PM
Plaintiff Trustee Witness and Exhibit List for April 10, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 4/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1.
12 12 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Wed 04/05 2:26 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023),9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A) (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023))
Saturday, March 11, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/11 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following:( 1.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON CONTACT THE COURTROOM DEPUTY, DEANNA CASTLEBERRY BY TELEPHONE (210) 472-6720 EXT. 5735 OR BY E-MAIL AT deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov to APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE OR WEBEX. (2.) IF YOU HAVE WITNESSES OR EXHIBITS YOU MUST APPEAR IN PERSON OR, IF GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT, BY WEBEX. (3.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 4/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 03/11/2023. (Admin.
Thursday, March 09, 2023
10 10 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Thu 03/09 11:16 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following:( 1.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON CONTACT THE COURTROOM DEPUTY, DEANNA CASTLEBERRY BY TELEPHONE (210) 472-6720 EXT. 5735 OR BY E-MAIL AT deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov to APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE OR WEBEX. (2.) IF YOU HAVE WITNESSES OR EXHIBITS YOU MUST APPEAR IN PERSON OR, IF GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT, BY WEBEX. (3.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 4/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 03/08 2:46 PM
Motion For Default Judgment against George Michael Villa Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023)
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/01 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default against George Michael Villa
Monday, February 27, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Mon 02/27 12:25 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against George Michael Villa (Mujica, Roxanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/23 3:38 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Defendant George Michael Villa filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa. Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023)
Friday, January 27, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/27 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa . Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023)
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 01/25 12:13 PM
Order for Plaintiff to Seek Default against George Michael Villa . Default Judgment Motion due by 2/24/2023 (Order entered on 1/25/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 12/16 5:08 PM
Summons Served on George Michael Villa - served on 12/8/2022 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 12/07 9:55 PM
Summons Issued on George Michael Villa Answer Due 01/6/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 9:55 PM
Adversary case 22-05094 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, William Drew Mallender, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against George Michael Villa (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]