Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05010
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
John M Vizy, Defendant
Represented By
John M Vizy
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
17 17 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 02/15 2:28 PM
DESTROYING Exhibits - NO Response filed by due date of 2/14/2024 by Mr. Pulman Related [+] Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on June 12, 2023
Related: [-] ument14 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)(Gonzalez, Rosa) (Entered: 06/13/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/11 1:14 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/15 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Final Default Judgment against John M. Vizy (related document(s):9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023)) (Order entered on 6/13/2023)
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order AP-Default Judgment (PDF) Tue 06/13 1:57 PM
FINAL Default Judgment against John M. Vizy Related [+] (Order entered on 6/13/2023) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
Monday, June 12, 2023
14 14 court Exhibit Index and Witness List (Adversary) Tue 06/13 12:20 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on June 12, 2023 Related [+] (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
13 13 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 06/12 2:14 PM
Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-5 for June 12, 2023 hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Plaintiff's Witness and Exhibit List for June 12, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)),10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) (related document(s):9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. )
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Mon 06/12 12:10 PM
Request for Telephonic Appearanc Related [+] (Date and Time of Hearing: 06/12/23 at 2:00 pm) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-] ason: Soley for purpose of law clerk to listen in for educational purposes, Phone: 210-222-9494 ext 1869 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)),10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1.
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Mon 06/12 12:30 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting Mr. Pulmans LAW CLERK Appearance at hearing on 6/12/2023, via Telephone (650) 479-3207 Access Code 2305 728 3687 #. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 06/13 10:47 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED-ORDER TO COME FROM RANDALL PULMAN*** . Related [+] Order due by 6/26/2023 (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
12 12 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 06/07 6:28 PM
Plaintiff's Witness and Exhibit List for June 12, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)),10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1.
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 06/06 11:32 AM
Request for Webex Appearanc Related [+] (Date and Time of Hearing: 6/12/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-] ason: The trustee, the Plaintiff, requests permission to appear by webex only to observe the hearing of his motion for default judgment., Phone: 830-407-51159 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Tue 06/06 1:30 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 6/12/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). (Castleberry, Deanna
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/17 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 05/17/2023. (Admin.
Monday, May 15, 2023
10 10 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Mon 05/15 9:50 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Friday, May 12, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/12 3:47 PM
Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant John M. Vizy Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Sunday, April 30, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default against John M Vizy
Friday, April 28, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Fri 04/28 1:32 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against John M Vizy (Mujica, Roxanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/27 12:16 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to John M. Vizy, Defendant filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Friday, April 07, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 04/05 2:24 PM
Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against John M. Vizy . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 02/03 10:10 AM
Summons Served on John M Vizy - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 01/31 10:32 PM
Summons Issued on John M Vizy Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 10:32 PM
Adversary case 23-05010 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against John M Vizy (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet