Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05011
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark Alan Zabinski, Defendant
Represented By
Mark Alan Zabinski
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Sunday, January 19, 2025
88 88 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/19 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 87 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Re: (related document(s):15 First Amended Complaint filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Mark Alan Zabinski)) (Order entered on 1/17/2025)
Friday, January 17, 2025
87 87 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 01/17 10:53 AM
Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Re: Related [+] (Order entered on 1/17/2025) (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 15 First Amended Complaint filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Mark Alan Zabinski)
court Create Scheduling Order Deadlines (Adversary) Fri 01/17 11:00 AM
Create- Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due 4/20/2025, Pre-Trial Order due by 5/10/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 5/1/2025. (Hardage, Bridget) Related [+]
Related: [-] 15 First Amended Complaint filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Mark Alan Zabinski)