Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05014
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Raul T Gomez, Defendant
Represented By
Raul T Gomez
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/14 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Motion For Entry of Default Judgment as Moot (related document(s):9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (Order entered on 3/12/2024)) Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
13 13 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 03/12 7:51 AM
Order Dismissing Motion For Entry of Default Judgment as Moot Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (Order entered on 3/12/2024) (Hardage, Bridget
Thursday, November 30, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/30 12:13 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 11/03 11:56 AM
Plaintiff Trustee's Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Raul T. Gomez filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 10/02 2:43 PM
Hearing RESET ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Hearing Scheduled For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 10/02/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE***.
Friday, September 29, 2023
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Fri 09/29 11:27 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: Anna K. MacFarlane, Reason: Announcement will be made, no exhibits or witnesses to present, ) (Date and Time of Hearing: October 2, 2023 at 2pm) filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Fri 09/29 12:40 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting Anne MacFarlane Appearance at hearing on 10/02/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. (Castleberry, Deanna
Thursday, September 14, 2023
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Thu 09/14 11:23 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 10/02/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. (Castleberry, Deanna
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Thu 09/14 10:48 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: The trustee requests permission to appear by webex merely to observe the hearing., Reason: In order to save the time and expense of travel from out of town., ) (Date and Time of Hearing: 10/2/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
Monday, August 07, 2023
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 08/07 2:39 PM
Hearing RESET ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Hearing Scheduled For 10/2/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1 (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 8/7/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Thursday, July 13, 2023
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Thu 07/13 6:24 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 8/07/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. (Castleberry, Deanna
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Thu 07/13 3:57 PM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: The trustee requests permission to appear by webex to save the expense of travel., Reason: To save the expense of travel for a short hearing on a matter which will likely be unopposed., Phone: 830-407-5115) (Date and Time of Hearing: 8/7/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
Monday, June 12, 2023
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 06/12 2:38 PM
Hearing RESET ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) Hearing Scheduled For 8/7/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 6/12/2023 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 06/06 11:40 AM
Request for Webex Appearanc Related [+] (Date and Time of Hearing: 6/12/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-] ason: The trustee, the Plaintiff, requests permission to appear by webex only to observe the hearing of his motion for default judgment., Phone: 830-407-51159 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023))
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Tue 06/06 1:33 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 6/12/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). (Castleberry, Deanna
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/17 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 05/17/2023. (Admin.
Monday, May 15, 2023
10 10 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Mon 05/15 10:32 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023). Hearing Scheduled For 6/12/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Friday, May 12, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/12 3:51 PM
Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Raul T. Gomez Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Saturday, April 29, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/29 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default against Raul T. Gomez
Thursday, April 27, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default (F) Thu 04/27 3:27 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Raul T. Gomez (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/26 2:59 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Raul T. Gomez, Defendant filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Friday, April 07, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 04/05 2:35 PM
Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Raul T. Gomez . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 02/03 10:13 AM
Summons Served on Raul T Gomez - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 01/31 10:43 PM
Summons Issued on Raul T Gomez Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 10:43 PM
Adversary case 23-05014 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Raul T Gomez (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet