Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05015
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Sheldon Rosen, Defendant
Represented By
David Sheldon Rosen
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 30, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/30 12:12 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 04, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/04 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 STATUS Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. )(related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against David Sheldon Rosen. Status Hearing Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 11/04/2023. (Admin.
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 11/03 11:57 AM
Plaintiff Trustee's Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against David Sheldon Rosen filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
11 11 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Thu 11/02 1:01 PM
STATUS Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against David Sheldon Rosen. Status Hearing Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
10 10 court Request For Summons (Auto) Tue 06/20 10:01 AM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on David Sheldon Rosen Answer Due 07/20/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 07, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/07 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against David Sheldon Rosen . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)) (Order entered on 5/5/2023)
Friday, May 05, 2023
8 8 order AP-Vacate Order (PDF) Fri 05/05 8:43 AM
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order Related [+] (Order entered on 5/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against David Sheldon Rosen . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
7 7 motion Vacate/Reconsider Order (Adversary) Wed 05/03 2:55 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Order Filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against David Sheldon Rosen. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Friday, April 14, 2023
6 6 court Request For Summons (Auto) Fri 04/14 2:01 PM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on David Sheldon Rosen Answer Due 05/15/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against David Sheldon Rosen . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 04/05 2:37 PM
Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against David Sheldon Rosen . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 02/03 10:14 AM
Summons Served on David Sheldon Rosen - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 01/31 10:46 PM
Summons Issued on David Sheldon Rosen Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 10:46 PM
Adversary case 23-05015 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against David Sheldon Rosen (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet