John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Shantell L. Wright
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michael M Parker |
Case #: | 5:23-ap-05018 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shantell L Wright, Defendant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() DESTROYING Exhibits - NO Response filed by due date of 2/14/2024 by Mr. Pulman Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on June 12, 2023 |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/11 1:20 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/15/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() FINAL Default Judgment against Shantell L. Wright (Order entered on 6/13/2023) (Paez, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing Held on June 12, 2023 (Gonzalez, Rosa) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adversary)
Tue 06/13 10:51 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED-ORDER TO COME FROM RANDALL PULMAN*** . . Order due by 6/26/2023 (Gonzalez, Rosa) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Plaintiff's Witness and Exhibit List for June 12, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
misc
Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance
Tue 06/06 11:43 AM
Request for Webex Appearanc (Date and Time of Hearing: 6/12/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John) |
||
court
Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request
Tue 06/06 1:34 PM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 6/12/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing |
|
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following:( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion For Default Judgment against Defendant Shantell L. Wright Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) |
|
Sunday, April 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/30/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against Shantell L Wright (Mujica, Roxanne) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default As to Shantell L. Wright, Defendant filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Shantell L. Wright . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Served on Shantell L Wright - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Shantell L Wright Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 23-05018 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Shantell L Wright (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |