Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05020
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Aug 14, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Louis Nazarino, Defendant
Represented By
Scott Louis Nazarino
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 14, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/14 11:02 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
12 12 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 08/11 5:34 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Claims Against Scott Louis Nazarino filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/14 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino. Default Judgment Motion due by 8/11/2023 (Order entered on 7/12/2023)
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
10 10 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 07/12 1:19 PM
Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino. Default Judgment Motion due by 8/11/2023 (Order entered on 7/12/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 07, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/07 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order (related document(s):4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)) (Order entered on 5/5/2023)
Friday, May 05, 2023
8 8 order AP-Vacate Order (PDF) Fri 05/05 8:44 AM
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order Related [+] (Order entered on 5/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
7 7 motion Vacate/Reconsider Order (Adversary) Wed 05/03 2:57 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Order Filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino. Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Friday, April 14, 2023
6 6 court Request For Summons (Auto) Fri 04/14 2:02 PM
Alias Summons Re-Issued on Scott Louis Nazarino Answer Due 05/15/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/07 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023)
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 order AP-Seek Default (F) Wed 04/05 3:53 PM
Order for John Patrick Lowe to Seek Default against Scott Louis Nazarino . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/5/2023 (Order entered on 4/5/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 02/03 10:18 AM
Summons Served on Scott Louis Nazarino - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 01/31 11:00 PM
Summons Issued on Scott Louis Nazarino Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 11:00 PM
Adversary case 23-05020 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Scott Louis Nazarino (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet