Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05023
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Domonic Raphael Cotton, Defendant
Represented By
Domonic Raphael Cotton
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/05 9:13 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/04 1:20 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05023 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet) (Pulman, Randall) Modified on 2/1/2023.
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Mon 03/04 3:03 PM
Hearing Held: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 03/04/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee against Domonic Raphael Cotton ( (Hardage, Bridget
Thursday, February 15, 2024
35 35 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 02/15 2:23 PM
DESTROYING Exhibits - NO Response filed by due date of 2/14/2024 by Mr. Pulman Related [+] Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing Held on 9/5/23 (Paez, Daniel) (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] ument28 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Monday, January 08, 2024
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 01/08 2:26 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 3/4/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY REGARDING 3 23-04668 - RSM - RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 1/8/2024 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
34 34 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 01/02 12:10 PM
Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Gregory W Hauswirth for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/01 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 31 Agreed Order Regarding (related document(s):30 Joint Motion to Continue the December 4, 2023 Docket Call Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton.) (Order entered on 11/29/2023)) Notice Date 12/01/2023. (Admin.
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
32 32 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 11/29 10:31 AM
Notice of Continued Docket Call - continued to 1.8.24 @ 2pm filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Continued to 1/8/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***CONTINUED FROM 12/4/2023 - PER ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE - MS. MACFARLANE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
31 31 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 11/29 9:31 AM
Agreed Order Regarding Related [+]
Related: [-] 30 Joint Motion to Continue the December 4, 2023 Docket Call Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton.) (Order entered on 11/29/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Wed 11/29 5:48 AM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Continued to 1/8/2024 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***CONTINUED FROM 12/4/2023 - PER ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE - MS. MACFARLANE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
30 30 motion Continue Hearing (Adversary) Tue 11/28 1:27 PM
Joint Motion to Continue the December 4, 2023 Docket Call Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER GRANTING AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 9/5/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***. ,24 Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):23 Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):17 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))) Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023)
Friday, September 08, 2023
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/08 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Regarding (related document(s):19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.) (Order entered on 9/6/2023)
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
27 27 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 09/06 10:29 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 9/6/2023) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
28 28 court Exhibit Index and Witness List (Adversary) Wed 09/06 12:50 PM
Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing Held on 9/5/23 Related [+] (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Tue 01/16 5:27 AM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED - Order to come from Randy Pulman***. Related [+] (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Thursday, August 31, 2023
26 26 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 08/31 3:48 PM
Trustee's Witness and Exhibit List for September 5, 2023 Hearing filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21-Day Objection Language) filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Wed 08/30 8:23 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting John Patrick Lowe Appearance at hearing on 9/05/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+] (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Wed 08/30 7:40 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: The trustee requests permission to appear at the hearing by webex merely to observe., Reason: To save the time and expense of travel., Phone: 830-407-5115) (Date and Time of Hearing: 9/5/2023 at 2 PM) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
misc Request for Telephonic or Webex Appearance Tue 08/29 7:39 AM
Request for Webex Appearance(Who: Webex Appearance by Gregory W. Hauswirth, Reason: To avoid additional travel costs for limited hearing as counsel is a resident of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Phone: 412-414-6996) (Date and Time of Hearing: September 5, 2023 at 2:00pm) filed by Gregory W Hauswirth for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Hauswirth, Gregory) Related [+]
Related: [-] 21 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
court Notice Regarding Telephonic or Webex Request Tue 08/29 8:06 AM
Judge's Notice, Gregory W. Hauswirth Permitting Appearance at hearing on 09/05/2023, via Webex, https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/Parker. Related [+](Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):23 Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):17 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))) Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023)
Monday, August 21, 2023
24 24 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Mon 08/21 1:34 PM
Second Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Discovery due 11/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/17/2023. (Order entered on 8/21/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 23 Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) (related document(s):17 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023))
Saturday, August 19, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Sat 08/19 11:45 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 12/4/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER GRANTING AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 9/5/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Thursday, August 17, 2023
23 23 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Thu 08/17 3:52 PM
Agreed Motion to Amend Order Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth, Anna K MacFarlane for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (MacFarlane, Anna) Related [+]
Related: [-] 17 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Friday, August 04, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/04 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 08/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
21 21 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Wed 08/02 11:50 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( 1.) IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. (2.) IF PARTIES DO NOT WISH TO APPEAR IN PERSON THEY MAY FILE A REQUEST WITH JUDGE PARKER IN CM/ECF USING THE OTHER CATEGORY FOR TELEPHONIC OR WEBEX APPEARANCE. ) Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
20 20 answer Objection (Adversary) Tue 08/01 9:40 PM
Objection Filed by Gregory W Hauswirth for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton. (Hauswirth, Gregory) Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee.
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
19 19 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 07/11 2:15 PM
Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/21 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Agreed Amended Scheduling Order (related document(s):16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))). Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023)
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
17 17 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Wed 04/19 12:27 PM
Agreed Amended Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due 7/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 8/29/2023, and Docket Call is set for 9/5/2023 at 2:00 p.m., San Antonio Courtroom 1. (Order entered on 4/19/2023) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s):13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (on behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton))
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Tue 04/18 4:10 PM
Docket Call RESET to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05023 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 9/5/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET PER ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER - RESET FROM 07/10/2023 - MR. PULMAN SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE TO PARTIES***.
Monday, April 17, 2023
16 16 motion Amend Order (Adversary) Mon 04/17 4:35 PM
Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Randall A. Pulman for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton, Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Pulman, Randall) Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 7/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 6/5/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 6/14/2023. (Order entered on 3/6/2023)
Monday, April 10, 2023
15 15 misc Statement Regarding Consent Mon 04/10 2:01 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Anna K MacFarlane for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (MacFarlane, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/08 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 13 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 7/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 6/5/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 6/14/2023. (Order entered on 3/6/2023)) Notice Date 03/08/2023. (Admin.
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 03/06 10:32 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton. Docket Call Set For 7/10/2023 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. Discovery due 6/5/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 7/3/2023, Dispositive Motions Due By 6/14/2023. (Order entered on 3/6/2023) (Castleberry, Deanna
Sunday, March 05, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/05 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Regarding (related document(s):6 Motion for Admission of Gregory W. Hauswirth Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/3/2023)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/05 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Regarding (related document(s):5 Motion for Admission of Patrick W. Carothers Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/3/2023)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/05 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 3/3/2023)
Friday, March 03, 2023
9 9 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 03/03 1:08 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 3/3/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Admission of Gregory W. Hauswirth Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
8 8 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 03/03 1:08 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 3/3/2023) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Admission of Patrick W. Carothers Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
7 7 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Fri 03/03 1:02 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 3/3/2023) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
6 6 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 03/02 11:42 PM
Motion for Admission of Gregory W. Hauswirth Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 03/02 11:40 PM
Motion for Admission of Patrick W. Carothers Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick W Carothers for Defendant Domonic Raphael Cotton (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/02 11:38 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Domonic Raphael Cotton (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 02/03 10:21 AM
Summons Served on Domonic Raphael Cotton - served on 2/1/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 01/31 11:10 PM
Summons Issued on Domonic Raphael Cotton Answer Due 03/2/2023 (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 11:10 PM
Adversary case 23-05023 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Chapter 7 Trustee (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Domonic Raphael Cotton (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Pulman, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet