Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-bk-10322
Case Filed:May 04, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jun 08, 2023
Claims Deadline:Aug 02, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024

Debtor
Duo Works, Inc.
512 W. Martin Luther King Blvd. Ste. 512
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Sophia K. Palat
Palat, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801


Docket last updated: 05/05/2023 12:03 AM CDT
Thursday, May 04, 2023
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Thu 05/04 1:21 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-10322 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23640194 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Thu 05/04 1:19 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Duo Works, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 05/11/2023 (Palat, Sophia)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 NA (F) Thu 05/04 1:38 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 6/8/2023 at 01:00 PM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#; (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
3 3 trustee 7 Trustee's Request Notice of Assets (F) Thu 05/04 1:44 PM
Trustee's Request For Notice of Assets - Proofs of Claim Due 8/2/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]