Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10322

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-ap-01018
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2023
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank
Registered Agent: C T Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
JPMorgan Chase Bank
contact info
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase New York Head Quarters
383 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
JPMorgan Chase New York Head Quarters
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
John Patrick Lowe
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, November 13, 2023
court Filing fee Paid in Full Mon 11/13 6:10 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RS. Receipt Number 103331. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/30 9:11 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
7 7 misc ~Document (Adversary) Thu 06/29 4:51 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/14 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Deferring Filing Fee (related document(s):4 Application to Defer Fee Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 6/12/2023)
Monday, June 12, 2023
5 5 order AP-Deferring Filing Fee (PDF) Mon 06/12 11:29 AM
Order Deferring Filing Fee Related [+] (Order entered on 6/12/2023) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 4 Application to Defer Fee Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
4 4 motion Defer Filing Fee (Adversary) Wed 06/07 4:07 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 06/07 3:50 PM
Summons Served on JPMorgan Chase New York Head Quarters - served on 6/7/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 06/07 2:53 PM
Summons Issued on JPMorgan Chase Bank Answer Due 07/7/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/07 2:53 PM
Adversary case 23-01018 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against JPMorgan Chase Bank (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet