San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:23-bk-50646 |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Dismissed: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2024 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 15, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC
418 Cameron Circle
San Antonio, TX 78258 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, October 18, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 10/18 10:31 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Boyd, Laurie) |