Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-50646

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bkrpcy Judge Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:23-ap-05044
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2023
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of San Antonio
1900 NW Loop 410
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Bank of San Antonio
contact info
Plaintiff
San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC
418 Cameron Circle
San Antonio, TX 78258
Represented By
Heidi McLeod
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 1:43 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 18, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/18 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Agreed Order Granting Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate (related document(s):1 Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate. Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)) (Order entered on 6/16/2023)
Friday, June 16, 2023
8 8 order AP-Judgment (PDF) Fri 06/16 2:53 PM
Agreed Order Granting Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate Related [+] (Order entered on 6/16/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate. Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, June 08, 2023
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Thu 06/08 11:27 AM
Hearing Held: ***AGREED JUDGMENT TO COME HEIDI MCLEOD*** .. Related [+] Order due by 6/22/2023 (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate. Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
7 7 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 06/07 1:49 PM
Summons Served on Bank of San Antonio - served on 6/2/2023 (McLeod, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Mon 06/05 8:41 AM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Complaint([LINK 23-05044 cag] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Amount $ 350.00, Receipt A23702253 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Sunday, June 04, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/04 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/04/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Granting (related document(s):3 Ex Parte Motion to Expedited Hearing Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by Heidi McLeod for Plaintiff San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McLeod, Heidi) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))) (Order entered on 6/2/2023)
Friday, June 02, 2023
5 5 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 06/02 4:33 PM
Order Granting Related [+] (Order entered on 6/2/2023) (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-] 3 Ex Parte Motion to Expedited Hearing Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by Heidi McLeod for Plaintiff San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McLeod, Heidi) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))
4 4 misc ~Document (Adversary) Fri 06/02 3:31 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Heidi McLeod for Plaintiff San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (McLeod, Heidi) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
3 3 motion Expedite Hearing (Adversary) Fri 06/02 11:09 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedited Hearing Complaint for Turnover of Assets of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by Heidi McLeod for Plaintiff San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC. (McLeod, Heidi) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 06/02 11:07 AM
Summons Issued on Bank of San Antonio Answer Due 07/3/2023 (McLeod, Heidi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/02 11:06 AM
Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (McLeod, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet
court Hearing (NO FORM) (Adversary) Fri 06/02 3:22 PM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 6/8/2023 at 10:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***HEIDI MCLEOD SHALL GIVE NOTICE OF HEARING*** (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05044 Complaint filed by San Antonio Asphalt & Maintenance, LLC (attorney Heidi McLeod) against Bank of San Antonio (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)