Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10433

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:23-ap-01022
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Registered Agent: CT Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Bank of America Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
John Patrick Lowe
J. Patrick Lowe P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Saturday, September 02, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/02 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Dismissing Complaint for Turnover of an Asset of the Bankruptcy Estate (related document(s):8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Turnover of an Asset of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 8/31/2023)
Thursday, August 31, 2023
10 10 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Thu 08/31 9:06 AM
Order Dismissing Complaint for Turnover of an Asset of the Bankruptcy Estate Related [+] (Order entered on 8/31/2023) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Turnover of an Asset of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/31 9:07 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/30 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 23-01022 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Bank of America Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). Docket Call Set For 2/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at us-courts.webex.com/meet/Mott, through the Cisco WebEx Meetings application, Discovery due 11/20/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2024, Dispositive Motions Due By 12/1/2023 . (Order entered on 8/28/2023)) Notice Date 08/30/2023. (Admin.
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
8 8 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 08/29 4:42 PM
Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Turnover of an Asset of the Bankruptcy Estate Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 28, 2023
7 7 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 08/28 2:44 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01022 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Bank of America Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). Docket Call Set For 2/7/2024 at 09:30 AM at us-courts.webex.com/meet/Mott, through the Cisco WebEx Meetings application, Discovery due 11/20/2023, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/31/2024, Dispositive Motions Due By 12/1/2023 . (Order entered on 8/28/2023) (Farrar, Ronda
Sunday, August 27, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/27 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 8/25/2023)
Friday, August 25, 2023
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Fri 08/25 12:24 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 8/25/2023) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
4 4 ans Response (Adversary) Thu 08/24 8:48 AM
Response Filed by Grant Figari for Defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Figari, Grant) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01022 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Bank of America Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Thursday, July 27, 2023
court Filing fee Paid in Full Thu 07/27 6:10 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RS. Receipt Number 103247. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Tue 07/25 11:23 AM
Summons Served on Bank of America Corporation - served on 7/25/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 07/25 10:36 AM
Summons Issued on Bank of America Corporation Answer Due 08/24/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/25 10:36 AM
Adversary case 23-01022 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Bank of America Corporation (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property))). (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet