Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher G Bradley
Case #: 1:23-bk-10433
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jul 27, 2023

Debtor
Charles Ford, LLC
2905 Windy Vane Dr.
Pflugerville, TX 78660
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer
Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801


Docket last updated: 06/21/2023 12:10 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 06/20 2:22 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-10433 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23734718 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Tue 06/20 2:09 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Charles Ford, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/27/2023 (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 06/20 2:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/27/2023 at 01:00 PM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Tue 06/20 2:21 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Joyce W. Lindauer for Debtor Charles Ford, LLC. (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Charles Ford, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/27/2023