Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-51523

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:23-ap-05089
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Defendant
Represented By
Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dennis J Concilla, Defendant
Represented By
Dennis J Concilla
contact info
Defendant
Andrew J. Federico, Defendant
Represented By
Andrew J. Federico
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Plaintiff
Attn: Randall A. Pulman 2161 NW Military Hwy., Suite 400
San Antonio, TX 78213
Represented By
Leslie Sara Hyman
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info
Randall A. Pulman
Pulman Cappuccio & Pullen LLP
contact info
Anna K MacFarlane
Pulman, Cappuccio & Pullen, LLP
contact info

GPO May 24 2024
Judge's Opinion (related document(s): 21 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Monica A. Sansalone for Defendants Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Dennis J. Concilla, Andrew J. Federico. and 22 Motion to Transfer Venue Alternatively Filed by Monica A. Sansalone for Defendants Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Dennis J. Concilla, Andrew J. Federico. (Order entered on 5/24/2024) (Castleberry, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
court Notice Regarding ZOOM Request (MMP) Mon 04/07 7:55 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting Kerry Alleyne-Simmons Appearance at hearing on 04/07/2025, via ZOOM, https://www.zoomgov.com/my/parkercourt1. Prior to the Hearing starting ALL PARTIES DIALING INTO ZOOM SHOULD MAKE SURE TO USE THE NAME IN WHICH WAS APPROVED FOR ZOOM. PARTIES WILL BE HELD IN A WAITING STATUS WHERE YOU WILL REMAIN UNTIL YOUR CASE IS CALLED AT WHICH TIME YOU WILL BE MOVED INTO THE LIVE COURT HEARING. Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Amended Complaint () filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Leslie Sara Hyman, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Dennis J Concilla, Andrew J. Federico. (Castleberry, Deanna
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) (Adversary) Mon 04/07 2:24 PM
STATUS Hearing RESET ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Amended Complaint () filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Leslie Sara Hyman, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Dennis J Concilla, Andrew J. Federico. Status Hearing set for 9/8/2025 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 4/7/2025 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***
Friday, April 04, 2025
misc Request for ZOOM Appearance (MMP) Fri 04/04 1:17 PM
Request for Zoom Appearance Who: Kerry S. Alleyne-Simmons, Reason: Save expense on attending Status Conference in person - case will need to be further abated, FormatText('(Date and Time of Hearing: April 7, 2025 at 2:00 p.m.)') filed by Kerry Alleyne-Simmons for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe (Alleyne-Simmons, Kerry) Related [+]
Related: [-] Hearing RESET ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) (related document(s):16 Amended Complaint filed by Randall A. Pulman for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe (Pulman, Randall) (related document(s):1 Original Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe (attorneys Anna K MacFarlane, Leslie Sara Hyman, Randall A. Pulman) (On Behalf of Trustee) against Carlile, Patchen & Murphy, LLP, Dennis J Concilla, Andrew J. Federico. Status Hearing Set For 4/7/2025 at 2:00 PM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna) ***RESET IN OPEN COURT FROM 12/2/2024 - NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN***.