Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:23-bk-51742
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jul 02, 2024
Claims Deadline:Apr 02, 2024
Dismissed:Mar 18, 2025

Debtor
CINCH WIRELINE SEERVICES, LLC
146 Motts Pkwy
Marion, TX 78124-0070
Represented By
James Samuel Wilkins
James S. Wilkins, PC
contact info
Debtor
Cinch Wireline Services, LLC
146 Motts Pkwy
Marion, TX 78124-0070
Represented By
James Samuel Wilkins
James S. Wilkins, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Shelby A. Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info
John Patrick Lowe
contact info

GPO Sep 11 2024
Order Denying (related document(s): 141 Motion to Disqualify Butch Boyd Law Firm, P.C. and Jordan & Ortiz, P.C. as Special Counsel for the Trustee (21 Day Objection Language) filed by Jameson Joseph Watts for Interested Party Cinch Energy Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Proposed Order)(Watts, Jameson) (Related Document(s): 57 Order Approving Employment of Application for Retention of Butch Boyd Law Firm, P.C. and Jordan & Ortiz, P.C. as Special Counsel for the Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §327(a) (related document(s): 42 Trustee's Supplement and Clarification of Application for Retention of Butch Boyd Law Firm, P.C. and Jordan & Ortiz, P.C. as Special Counsel for the Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(a) (21 Day Objection Language) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Ernest "Butch" Boyd Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 2 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Declaration of Shelby A. Jordon Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 3 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental and Corrected Disclosure of Compensation Under 11 U.S.C. Section 329(e) and Bankruptcy Rule 2016(b) # 4 Exhibit 4 - Engagement Letter # 5 Service List # 6 Proposed Order) (Lowe, John) (related document(s): 37 Application for Retention of Butch Boyd Law Firm, P.C. and Jordan & Ortiz, P.C. as Counsel for the Estate Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(a) (21 Day Objection Language) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Trustee John Patrick Lowe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Butch Boyd Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Shelby A. Jordan Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 3 Exhibit 3 - Disclosure of Compensation Under 11 U.S.C. Section 329 and Bankruptcy Rule 2016 (b) # 4 Service List # 5 Proposed Order), 41 Supplemental Trustee's Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Engagement Letter # 2 Service List)(Lowe, John) (related document(s): 37 Application for Retention of Butch Boyd Law Firm, P.C. and Jordan & Ortiz, P.C. as Counsel for the Estate Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327(a) (21 Day Objection Language) filed by John Patrick Lowe for Trustee John Patrick Lowe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Butch Boyd Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Shelby A. Jordan Pursuant to Rules 2014 and 2016 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure # 3 Exhibit 3 - Disclosure of Compensation Under 11 U.S.C. Section 329 and Bankruptcy Rule 2016 (b) # 4 Service List # 5 Proposed Order))) Modified on 3/4/2024.) (Order entered on 3/26/2024))) (Order entered on 9/11/2024) (Paez, Daniel)
GPO Mar 18 2025
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Bankruptcy Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (related document(s): 299 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Jason Alexander Enright for Interested Party Simmons Bank (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/18/2025) (Sosa, Alma)

Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 9:24 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Wed 12/13 5:21 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-51742 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24105900 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Wed 12/13 5:13 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) without Schedules, without Statements, (Filing Fee: $338.00) filed by Cinch Wireline Services, LLC - Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 12/20/2023 (Wilkins, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 12/13 11:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]