Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-51742

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bkrpcy Judge Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:24-ap-05007
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mary Kay McGuffin
Represented By
Mary Kay McGuffin
contact info
Defendant
Justin Sprencel
Represented By
Justin Sprencel
contact info
Defendant
Michael R. Mendietta
Represented By
Michael R. Mendietta
contact info
Plaintiff
Cinch Wireline Services, LLC
146 Motts Parkway
Marion, TX 78124
Represented By
Paul W. O'Finan
S M Chaudhry, Esq., Attorney At Law PLLC
contact info
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Shelby A. Jordan
Jordan & Ortiz, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, March 18, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/18 3:31 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/14 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Mooting (related document(s):3 Motion to Dismiss Case and Strike Adversary Proceeding, Motion for Sanctions and Compelling Turn Over of All Communications by or Between All Persons or Entities and Counsel Filing This Adversary (21-Day Objection Language) filed by Shelby A. Jordan for Trustee John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/12/2024)
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 03/12 8:41 AM
Order Mooting Related [+] (Order entered on 3/12/2024) (Paez, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Dismiss Case and Strike Adversary Proceeding, Motion for Sanctions and Compelling Turn Over of All Communications by or Between All Persons or Entities and Counsel Filing This Adversary (21-Day Objection Language) filed by Shelby A. Jordan for Trustee John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/08 4:39 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Paul W. O'Finan for Plaintiff Cinch Wireline Services, LLC (O'Finan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
4 4 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 03/06 3:54 PM
***PDF OF PROPOSED ORDER*** Corrected Proposed Order filed by Shelby A. Jordan for Trustee John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Jordan, Shelby) Modified on 3/7/2024 (Sosa, Alma)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss Case (Adversary) Wed 03/06 3:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case and Strike Adversary Proceeding, Motion for Sanctions and Compelling Turn Over of All Communications by or Between All Persons or Entities and Counsel Filing This Adversary (21-Day Objection Language) filed by Shelby A. Jordan for Trustee John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Jordan, Shelby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Tue 03/05 1:42 PM
Summons Issued on Mary Kay McGuffin, Answer Due 04/4/2024; Justin Sprencel, Answer Due 04/4/2024; and Michael R. Mendietta, Answer Due 04/4/2024. (O'Finan, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/05 1:42 PM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Cinch Wireline Services, LLC (attorney Paul W. O'Finan) against Mary Kay McGuffin, Justin Sprencel, Michael R. Mendietta (Filing Fee: $350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment))). (O'Finan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit