New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-bk-10118
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024

Debtor
GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.

,
Represented By
Gregory Allan Bray
Milbank LLP
contact info
Kathryn A. Coleman
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
contact info
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Andrew M Leblanc
Milbank LLP
contact info
Debtor
Gol Finance (Luxembourg)

,
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 12:26 AM EDT
Attorney
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
Represented By
Kathryn A. Coleman
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
contact info
Attorney
Milbank LLP
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Attorney
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
Represented By
Brett H. Miller
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
(f/k/a Prime Clerk LLC) 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Adam M. Adler
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
contact info
Creditor
AWAS 32415 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
AWAS 43986 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
AWAS 43987 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
AWAS 43989 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
AWAS 43990 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
AerDragon Aviation Partners Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Aguapei Aviation Leasing Limited (f/k/a Sky Aircraft B39634 Limited)
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Akad Seguros S.A.
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Creditor
Aviation Capital Group LLC
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Azul S.A.
Represented By
Timothy E. Graulich
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Creditor
BOC Aviation (Ireland) Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 34654
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 34655
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 34997
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 34998
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 44008
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 44023
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee for MSN 44031
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
C&E Engine Leasing Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Computershare Trust Company, National Association
Represented By
Thomas A. Pitta
Emmet, Marvin & Martin LLP
contact info
Creditor
DAE (SABS) Leasing (Ireland) 45 Designated Activity Company
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
DAE 40235 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Dragao Aviacao Leasing Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Dubai Aerospace Enterprise (DAE) Ltd
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
EOS Aviation 4 (Ireland) Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
EOS Aviation 9 (Ireland) Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Elliott Investment Management L.P.
Represented By
Ira S. Dizengoff
Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Engine Lease Finance Corporation
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
GAL MSN 39614 Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Genesis Aircraft Services Limited
Represented By
Shawn Randall Fox
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Genesis Funding Norway 1 AS
Represented By
Shawn Randall Fox
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Genesis Funding Sweden 1 AB
Represented By
Shawn Randall Fox
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Global Aviation Equipment Leasing I Ireland Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Gol 2026 Senior Secured Notes Ad Hoc Group
Represented By
Jane Vanlare
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
John D. Beck
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Pieter Van Tol
Van Tol Law PLLC
contact info
David H. Botter
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Luke A Barefoot
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Goodyear Do Brasil Produtos De Borracha LTDA
Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP 200 Public Square, Suite 1400
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Carrie M Brosius
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Creditor
Greater Orlando Aviation Authority
Rumberger, Kirk, & Caldwell 2001 Park Place North Suite 1300
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Richard Scott Williams
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell
contact info
Creditor
Gryphon Trading Company, LLC
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By
Deborah D. Williamson
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Creditor
JSA International U.S. Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jackson Square Aviation Ireland Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jackson Square Aviation, LLC
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jetair 10 Limited (f/k/a Sky Aircraft B39629 Limited)
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Jetair 11 Limited (f/k/a Sky Aircraft B41163 Limited)
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Kornerstone Airlease No. 1 Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Macquarie Aerospace Finance 35845-2 Trust
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Macquarie AirFinance Acquisitions (UK) Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Merino Aerospace Finance 35845 Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Merino Aerospace Finance 36566 Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
More Design LTDA
Represented By
Courtney Ann Vincent
Vincent Law, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Navigator Aviation MSN 39613 Trust
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
ORIX Aviation Systems Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Creditor
Pioneer Aircraft Leasing Three Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
RECARO Aircraft Seating Americas, LLC
Represented By
Gordon J. Toering
Warner Norcross & Judd LLP
contact info
Creditor
SFV Aircraft Holdings IRE 1 Designated Activity Company
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
SFV Aircraft Holdings IRE TLC DAC
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
SMBC Aviation Capital Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Santa Rosa Leasing LLC
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sapphire Leasing I (AOE 7) Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Sindicato Nacional dos Aeronautas
Represented By
William Randell Wilder
Wilder Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Sky High LXXXV Leasing Company Limited
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Gary D. Bressler
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Creditor
UMB Bank, National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for ESNs 889564, 888558
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
UMB Bank, National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for MSN 60715
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
UMB Bank, National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as owner trustee for MSN 67772
Represented By
Barbra R. Parlin
Holland & Knight
contact info
Brian Smith
Holland & Knight
contact info
Creditor
Vibra Energia
Represented By
Paul Keenan, Jr
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Creditor
WWTAI AirOpCo II DAC
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By
Glenn E. Siegel
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Creditor
Zephyrus Capital Aviation Partners 1F Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Zephyrus Capital Aviation Partners 2A Limited
Represented By
Michael James Edelman
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Securities & Exchange Commission
100 Pearl Street Suite 20-100
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Alan S. Maza
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Creditor
Whitebox Advisors LLC
Represented By
Richard James Cooper
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas S. Kessler
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Thomas Q Lynch
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Rishi Zutshi
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Weaver
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Two Seas Global (Master) Fund LP
Represented By
Andrew K. Glenn
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of GOL Linhas Areas Inteligentes S.A.
Represented By
Brett H. Miller
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
AlixPartners, LLP
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Interested Party
AerCap Ireland Limited
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Michael G. Burke
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Sorkin
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Dianne F. Coffino
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Jonathan J. Weichselbaum
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Interested Party
BANCO DO BRASIL S.A.
Represented By
Daniela Fonseca Puggina
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Gabriela Barreto Menna Barreto Scanlon
Mb Scanlon PLLC
contact info
Debra A. Dandeneau
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Banco Bradesco S.A.
Represented By
Gabriela Barreto Menna Barreto Scanlon
Mb Scanlon PLLC
contact info
Richard Corbi
The Law Offices Of Richard J. Corbi PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Banco Santander (Brasil) S.A.
Represented By
Joshua R. Taylor
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Reisner
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CFMI
Represented By
Dabin Chung
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Gary W. Marsh
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Matthew R. Brooks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Tori Lynn Remington
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
GE Aerospace
Represented By
Dabin Chung
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Interested Party
LATAM Airlines Group S.A. and TAM Linhas Aeras S.A.
Represented By
Kyle J. Ortiz
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Interested Party
LATAM Airlines Group S.A. and TAM Linhas Aereas S.A.
Represented By
Kyle J. Ortiz
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee for the 3.75% Exchangeable Senior Notes due 2024, 7.00% Senior Notes due 2025, and 8.75% Perpetual Notes
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Interested Party
UMB Bank, National Association (as successor to The Bank of New York Mellon) as the Abra Notes Trustee
Represented By
Alex R. Rovira
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Alton Aviation Consultancy LLC
Other Prof.
Ernst & Young Auditores Independentes S/S Ltda.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Jefferies LLC
Other Prof.
Seabury International Corporate Finance LLC and Seabury Securities LLC
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Stocche, Forbes, Filizzola, Clapis e Cursino de Moura Sociedade de Advogados
Spec. Counsel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Susheel Kirpalani
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Annie Wells
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
Alixpartners International, Inc. and Alixpartners, LLP
Unknown
Abra Global Finance
Represented By
Richard Gary Mason
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Amy R. Wolf
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Unknown
Abra Group Limited
Represented By
Richard Gary Mason
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Amy R. Wolf
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Unknown
Ad Hoc Group of Abra Noteholders
Represented By
Allan S. Brilliant
Dechert LLP
contact info
Unknown
Capitania Air Fundo de Investimento Multimercado Credito Privado Investimento no Exterior
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Gilton Silveira De Souza
Unknown
Ernst & Young Auditores Independentes S/S Ltda.
Unknown
GAC, Inc.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
GOL Linhas Aereas S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
GTX S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Gol Equity Finance
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Gol Finance (Cayman)
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
Unknown
Seabury International Corporate Finance LLC and Seabury Securities LLC
Unknown
Smiles Fidelidade Argentina S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Smiles Fidelidade S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Smiles Viagens e Turismo S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Smiles Viajes y Turismo S.A.
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Sorriso Fundo de Investimento em Cotas de Fundos de Investimento Multimercado Credito Privado Investimento no Exterior
Represented By
Evan R. Fleck
Milbank LLP
contact info
Unknown
Scott Thompson
Unknown
Wilmington Trust SP Services (Dublin) Limited
Represented By
Robert Johnson
Clifford Chance Us LLP
contact info
Unknown
Carlos Melgar

GPO Apr 22 2024
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 4/22/2024, Approving Settlements but Striking the Lockup Provisions From Stipulations With Lessors. (related document(s)379, 382, 395, 380) (Anderson, Deanna)
GPO Jul 02 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order signed on 7/2/2024 Authorizing GOL to Make Incentive Payments. (related document(s)704, 734, 749) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)

Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
1563 1563 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 05/02 5:44 PM
Affidavit of Service of Emma Greeley Regarding 2026 Senior Secured Notes Claims Subscription Form, and Rights Offering Memorandum filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-]
1562 1562 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 11:39 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on May 1, 2025 at 10:00 AM RE: Status Conference Held Using Zoom for Government; Discovery Conference Using Zoom for Government. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/31/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/9/2025. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/2/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/31/2025. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-] 1547
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1561 1561 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/01 2:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of Engels Medina Regarding Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Debtors and SMBC Aero Engine Lease B.V. Regarding Claim Allowance and Related Matters, and Monthly Fee Statement of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, as Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1549 ,1550
1560 1560 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/01 2:10 PM
Affidavit of Service of Engels Medina Regarding Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of Milbank LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Counsel to the Debtors from March 1, 2025 through and Including March 31, 2025, and Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of AlixPartners International, Inc. And AlixPartners, LLP, Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 1557 ,1556
1559 1559 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/01 1:07 PM
Affidavit of Service of Ishrat Khan Regarding Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Debtors and the SMBC Lessor Parties Regarding Claim Allowance and Related Matters, Order Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims), Order Granting Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Claims), Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims), Order Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims), Order Granting Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims), and Order Granting Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims) Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1544 ,1543 ,1542 ,1540 ,1546 ,1545 ,1541
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1558 1558 263 pgs plan Chapter 11 Plan Wed 04/30 11:43 PM
Chapter 11 Plan / Notice of Filing of Second Plan Supplement Related [+] filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 1539 ,1389
1557 1557 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 6:56 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of AlixPartners International, Inc. and AlixPartners, LLP, Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of AlixPartners, LLP. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 251
1556 1556 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 6:51 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of Milbank LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Counsel to the Debtors From March 1, 2025 Through and Including March 31, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of Milbank LLP. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 292
1555 1555 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 5:12 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Thirteenth Monthly Fee Statement of Stocche, Forbes, Filizzola, Clapis E Cursino De Moura Sociedade De Advogados, as Brazilian Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by Brett H. Miller on behalf of Stocche, Forbes, Filizzola, Clapis e Cursino de Moura Sociedade de Advogados. (Miller, Brett)
Related: [-]
1554 1554 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 5:05 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Thirteenth Monthly Statement of Jefferies LLC for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Investment Banker for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from March 1, 2025 to and including March 31, 2025 Filed by Brett H. Miller on behalf of Jefferies LLC. (Miller, Brett)
Related: [-]
1553 1553 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 4:38 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by Brett H. Miller on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Miller, Brett)
Related: [-]
1552 1552 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 4:28 PM
Monthly Fee Statement / Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 Filed by Brett H. Miller on behalf of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP. (Miller, Brett)
Related: [-]
1551 1551 5 pgs order Order Re: Application, Interim Professional Compensation Wed 04/30 3:52 PM
Order signed on 4/30/2025 Granting the Interim Fee Application of Professionals for Allowance and Payment of Interim Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred Related [+]for Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP, fees awarded: $2348647.00, expense awarded: $3842.58, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC, fees awarded: $511482.50, expense awarded: $0.00, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Jefferies LLC, fees awarded: $700000.00, expense awarded: $20375.50, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Stocche, Forbes, Filizzola, Clapis e Cursino de Moura Sociedade de Advogados, fees awarded: $93671.28, expense awarded: $0.00, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Alton Aviation Consultancy LLC, fees awarded: $1277223.00, expense awarded: $57095.10, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Milbank LLP, fees awarded: $11242624.63, expense awarded: $67835.64, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Ernst & Young Auditores Independentes S/S Ltda., fees awarded: $456870.78, expense awarded: $47328.98, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Seabury International Corporate Finance LLC and Seabury Securities LLC, fees awarded: $2068095.00, expense awarded: $32755.76, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor AlixPartners, LLP, fees awarded: $3097762.50, expense awarded: $44254.04, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP, fees awarded: $4255147.20, expense awarded: $0.00, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensationfor Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, fees awarded: $19233.32, expense awarded: $0.00 . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
1550 1550 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 04/30 1:42 PM
Stipulation and Agreed Order, Signed on 4/30/2025, Between the Debtors and SMBC Aero Engine Lease B.V. Regarding Claim Allowance and Related Matters (ESN 661338). Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1530
1549 1549 misc Monthly Fee Statement Wed 04/30 11:56 AM
Monthly Fee Statement of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, as Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the Period from March 1, 2025 through March 31, 2025 filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1548 1548 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 11:07 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nelson Crespin Regarding Omnibus Certificate of No Objection and Certificate of No Objection Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1538 ,1537
1547 1547 3 pgs notice Notice, Hearing Tue 04/29 6:12 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Discovery and Status Conference on Thursday, May 1, 2025 at 10:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) and Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.. with hearing to be held on 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 1382
1546 1546 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:48 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1354
1545 1545 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:44 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1353
1544 1544 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:37 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Bondholder Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1352
1543 1543 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:32 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1351
1542 1542 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:27 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1350
1541 1541 order Motion, Objection to Claim Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1349
1540 1540 order So Ordered Stipulation Tue 04/29 10:07 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order, Signed on 4/29/2025, Between the Debtors and the SMBC Lessor Parties Regarding Claim Allowance and Related Matters (MSNs 35829, 36149, 39607, 39609, 39614, 39616, 39623, 39629, 39634, 39636, and 41163). Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 1521
Monday, April 28, 2025
1539 1539 557 pgs plan Chapter 11 Plan Mon 04/28 11:33 PM
Chapter 11 Plan / Notice of Filing of Plan Supplement Related [+] filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 1389
Sunday, April 27, 2025
1538 1538 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Sun 04/27 8:24 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Related [+] Filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 1357 ,1376 ,1358 ,1372 ,1373 ,1363 ,1377 ,1374 ,1360 ,1375 ,1362
1537 1537 ans Statement of No Objection Sun 04/27 1:16 PM
Statement of No Objection / Omnibus Certificate of No Objection Related [+] filed by Evan R. Fleck on behalf of GOL Linhas Aereas Inteligentes S.A.. (Fleck, Evan)
Related: [-] 1351 ,1396 ,1350 ,1349 ,1354 ,1353 ,1352
Friday, April 25, 2025
1536 1536 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 04/25 11:29 AM
Affidavit of Service of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Between the Debtors and SMBC Aero Engine Lease B.V. Regarding Claim Allowance and Related Matters, and Notice of Filing of Supplemental Engagement Letter in Accordance with Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Ernst & Young Auditores Independentes S/S LTDA. As Auditor for the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David)
Related: [-] 1530 ,1532