Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 6:24-bk-60204
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Creditor Meeting:May 30, 2024
Discharged:Jul 18, 2024
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 15, 2024

Debtor
Kevin Ray Lock
5811 Hopkins Dr
Temple, TX 76502-5756
Represented By
Frank D. Thomas, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
James Studensky
3912 W. Waco Drive
Waco, TX 76710


Docket last updated: 08/14/2024 6:28 PM CDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Thu 04/11 2:46 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-60204 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A24362773 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Thu 04/11 2:38 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Individual) Without Schedules, Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Kevin Ray Lock. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/18/2024 (Thomas, Frank)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor Only Thu 04/11 2:51 PM
Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor filed by Frank D. Thomas Jr.for Debtor Kevin Ray Lock. (Thomas, Frank)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Thu 04/11 2:53 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Frank D. Thomas Jr.for Debtor Kevin Ray Lock. (Thomas, Frank)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Individual) Without Schedules, Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Kevin Ray Lock. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/18/2024
4 4 court Chapter 7 Auto Assignment Thu 04/11 11:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Studensky, James added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 10:30 AM at Via Phone: (866)712-8061; Code: 5682533#. ; Objections to Discharge/Dischargeability due by 7/15/2024 (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]