Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-60204

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 6:24-ap-06014
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin Ray Lock
5811 Hopkins Drive
Temple, TX 76502
Represented By
Kevin Ray Lock
contact info
Plaintiff
Smyrna Ready Mix d/b/a SRM Concrete
Crady Jewett McCulley & Houren LLP c/o William Sudela 2727 Allen Parkway Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77019
Represented By
William R. Sudela
Crady Jewett Mcculley & Houren LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, August 23, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/23 11:43 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/17 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Agreed Judgment (related document(s):10 Motion to Enter Agreement Judgment filed by Frank D. Thomas Jr. for Defendant Kevin Ray Lock (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 8/14/2024)
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 order AP-Judgment (PDF) Wed 08/14 7:52 AM
Agreed Judgment Related [+] (Order entered on 8/14/2024) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Enter Agreement Judgment filed by Frank D. Thomas Jr. for Defendant Kevin Ray Lock (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 08/13 4:52 PM
Motion to Enter Agreement Judgment filed by Frank D. Thomas Jr. for Defendant Kevin Ray Lock (Thomas, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 misc Statement Regarding Consent Mon 07/15 3:47 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by William R. Sudela for Plaintiff Smyrna Ready Mix d/b/a SRM Concrete (Sudela, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 07/15 3:46 PM
Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff filed by William R. Sudela for Plaintiff Smyrna Ready Mix d/b/a SRM Concrete (Sudela, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 04, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/04 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 7/2/2024)
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/04 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 4 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Complaint of Smyrna Ready Mix Concrete LLC. d/b/a SRM Concrete Objecting to Dischargeability of Indebtedness (11 U.S.C. $523) (NO COVER SHEET) (attorney William R. Sudela) against Kevin Ray Lock. Docket Call set for 11/12/2024 at 2:00 PM at Waco Bankruptcy Courtroom 1. : Discovery due 9/30/2024, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/5/2024, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/10/2024. (Order entered on 7/2/2024)) Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Tue 07/02 8:40 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 7/2/2024) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-]
4 4 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Tue 07/02 5:21 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint of Smyrna Ready Mix Concrete LLC. d/b/a SRM Concrete Objecting to Dischargeability of Indebtedness (11 U.S.C. $523) (NO COVER SHEET) (attorney William R. Sudela) against Kevin Ray Lock. Docket Call set for 11/12/2024 at 2:00 PM at Waco Bankruptcy Courtroom 1. : Discovery due 9/30/2024, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/5/2024, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/10/2024. (Order entered on 7/2/2024) (Castleberry, Deanna
Monday, July 01, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 4:06 PM
Response of Kevin Ray Lock to the Objection of Smyrna Read Mix concrete, LLC dba SRM Concrete to the Dischargeability of Indebtedness (11 U.S.C. 523) filed by Kevin Ray Lock, (Thomas, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 06/03 10:09 AM
Summons Issued on Kevin Ray Lock Answer Due 07/3/2024 (Sudela, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/03 10:09 AM
Adversary case 24-06014 Complaint filed by Smyrna Ready Mix d/b/a SRM Concrete (attorney William R. Sudela) against Kevin Ray Lock (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny))). (Sudela, William)
Related: [-]