Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10807
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Norris Training Systems, LLC
2525 W Anderson Ln Ste 365
Austin, TX 78757-1180
Represented By
Jennifer Francine Wertz
Jackson Walker, L.L.P.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
court Hearing (NO FORM) Thu 04/24 8:51 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+] Status Hearing Set For 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 ...COUNSEL FOR MOVANT IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING. NOTICE SHOULD INCLUDE... https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 229 Chapter 11 Plan, Disclosure Statement filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC.
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
334 334 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 327 Sua Sponte Order Setting Status Hearing On (related document(s):229 Chapter 11 Plan, Disclosure Statement filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC., and256 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List)) (Order entered on 4/21/2025)
333 333 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/23 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 326 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (Related Document(s):311 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Interested Party Vestian Global Workplace Services, LLC ) Status Hearing Set For 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 ...COURT REQUESTS THE STATUS CONFERENCE
332 332 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/23 2:26 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 2/28/2025 filed by Aaron Lozano for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC. (Lozano, Aaron)
Related: [-]
331 331 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/23 2:20 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10809 for the Month Ending: 2/28/2025 filed by Aaron Lozano for JointAdmin Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC. (Lozano, Aaron)
Related: [-]
330 330 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/23 2:14 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10808 for the Month Ending: 2/28/2025 filed by Aaron Lozano for JointAdmin Debtor Norris Management, LLC. (Lozano, Aaron)
Related: [-]
329 329 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/23 2:10 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10810 for the Month Ending: 2/28/2025 filed by Aaron Lozano for JointAdmin Debtor Surge Norris Holding LLC. (Lozano, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
328 328 misc ~Document Tue 04/22 3:23 PM
Notice of Status Conference filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC. (Wertz, Jennifer) Related [+]
Related: [-] 256 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ),,, filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List),311 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ),,, filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Interested Party Vestian Global Workplace Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, April 21, 2025
327 327 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 04/21 3:23 PM
Sua Sponte Order Setting Status Hearing On Related [+] (Order entered on 4/21/2025) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 229 Chapter 11 Plan, Disclosure Statement filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC., and256 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ) Filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List)
326 326 court Hearing (F) Mon 04/21 7:46 AM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Status Hearing Set For 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 ...COURT REQUESTS THE STATUS CONFERENCE (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 311 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Interested Party Vestian Global Workplace Services, LLC
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 04/21 7:48 AM
Hearing RESET FROM 4/17/25 TO 5/29/25 Related [+] Status Hearing Set For 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/robinson.txwb via Zoom or Call 669-254-5252 Meeting ID: 161 0862 5245 ...RESET IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY THE COURT... (Lopez, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 256 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ),,, filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC
Thursday, April 17, 2025
325 325 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 320 Order Allowing Extension of Time, 04/17/25 (related document(s):302 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Order Setting Hearing on Disclosure Statement and Related Deadlines (21 Day Negative Notice Language) filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wertz, Jennifer)Modified on 3/21/2025 .) ,; (Order entered on 4/15/2025)
324 324 answer Objection Thu 04/17 4:59 PM
Objection Filed by Frances A. Smith for Interested Party Modern Bank, NA (Smith, Frances) Related [+]
Related: [-] 311 Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ),,, filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Interested Party Vestian Global Workplace Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Tue 04/22 10:07 AM
Hearing NOT Held: Agreed Order Entered. Related [+] (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 265 Omnibus Motion to Assume Lease (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Tue 04/22 10:24 AM
Hearing Held: Withdrawn; file an amended disclosure statement and plan by 5/27/25 and status conference set for 5/29/25 at 10:00 am via Zoom - OTC By Court. Related [+] (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 229 Chapter 11 Plan, Disclosure Statement filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Norris Training Systems, LLC.