Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10807

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10809
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Catering by Norris, LLC
13810 Champion Forest Dr Ste 144
Houston, TX 77069-1868
Represented By
Jennifer Francine Wertz
Jackson Walker, L.L.P.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/17 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number 24-10807 (related document(s):2 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 7/15/2024)
8 8 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Wed 07/17 10:39 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Jennifer Francine Wertz for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC. (Wertz, Jennifer)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Catering by Norris, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 07/17/2024 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 11/7/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 11/7/2024,
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 order BK-Jointly Administering Cases (pdf) Mon 07/15 3:34 PM
Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number 24-10807 Related [+] (Order entered on 7/15/2024) (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Event (Public) Mon 07/15 3:36 PM
Court Public Entry: A docket entry shall be made in each of the Debtors cases substantially as follows: An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Norris Training Systems, LLC, Surge Norris Holdings LLC, Catering by Norris, LLC and Norris Management, LLC; the docket in the chapter 11 case of Norris Training Systems, LLC, Case No. 24-10807 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case; (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/14 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 8/5/2024 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)711-2282; Code: 3544189#- Proofs of Claim Due 11/4/2024
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (F) Fri 07/12 2:37 PM
341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 8/5/2024 at 10:00 AM via Via Phone: (866)711-2282; Code: 3544189#- Proofs of Claim Due 11/4/2024 (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Fri 07/12 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST Shane P. Tobin (Tobin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/11 8:53 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC. (Butler, Beau) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
3 3 misc ~Document Thu 07/11 4:26 PM
List of Creditors Verification filed by Genevieve M. Graham for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs motion Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases Thu 07/11 12:24 AM
Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Beau Butler for Debtor Catering by Norris, LLC(Butler, Beau)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 07/10 11:37 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Catering by Norris, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 07/17/2024 Chapter 11 Plan Due by 11/7/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 11/7/2024, (Wertz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Wed 07/10 11:42 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-10809 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A24577353 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1