Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10433

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher G Bradley
Case #: 1:24-ap-01046
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Charles Ford
2905 Windy Vane Dr.
Pflugerville, TX 78660
Represented By
Charles Ford
contact info
Plaintiff
John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
John Patrick Lowe
J. Patrick Lowe P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 misc ~Document (Adversary) Wed 04/09 4:04 PM
Release of Judgment and Abstract of Judgment filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Regarding (related document(s):18 Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment # 2 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 3/4/2025)
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 03/04 3:16 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 3/4/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment # 2 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Thu 03/06 2:58 PM
Hearing Held: Granted. Related [+] (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment # 2 Proposed Order)
Friday, February 14, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/14 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: (related document(s):18 Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. Hearing Scheduled For 3/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085 ) Notice Date 02/14/2025. (Admin.
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
19 19 court Hearing (F) (Adversary) Wed 02/12 2:58 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+]
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. Hearing Scheduled For 3/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085 (Farrar, Ronda
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Thu 02/06 2:37 PM
Motion for Leave to Serve Post-Judgment Interrogatories Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 court Event with PDF (Adversary) (Public) Thu 02/06 12:50 PM
Court Entry: Abstract Of Judgment (Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/27 2:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/23 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Mooting (related document(s):12 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Pre-trial Order and to Continue the Docket Call for Trial Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/21/2025)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/23 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Summary Judgment (related document(s):11 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Patrick Lowe, Trustee # 2 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/21/2025)
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Tue 01/21 2:37 PM
Order Mooting Related [+] (Order entered on 1/21/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 12 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Pre-trial Order and to Continue the Docket Call for Trial Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
13 13 order AP-Summary Judgment (PDF) Tue 01/21 2:24 PM
Summary Judgment Related [+] (Order entered on 1/21/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 11 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Patrick Lowe, Trustee # 2 Proposed Order)
Monday, January 20, 2025
12 12 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Mon 01/20 4:00 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Pre-trial Order and to Continue the Docket Call for Trial Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
11 11 motion Summary Judgment (Adversary) Fri 12/20 3:09 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee. (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of John Patrick Lowe, Trustee
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 misc Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 1:50 PM
First Amended Complaint () filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Charles Ford (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, September 28, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/28 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Charles Ford (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). Docket Call Set For 2/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085, Discovery due 12/13/2024, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/28/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 12/23/2024 . (Order entered on 9/26/2024)) Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Thu 09/26 2:54 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Charles Ford (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). Docket Call Set For 2/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085, Discovery due 12/13/2024, Pre-Trial Order due by 1/28/2025, Dispositive Motions Due By 12/23/2024 . (Order entered on 9/26/2024) (Farrar, Ronda
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/20 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 9/18/2024)
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 09/18 3:43 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by John Patrick Lowe for Plaintiff John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Wed 09/18 3:13 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 9/18/2024) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 6:03 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Charles Ford, (Sather, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
court Filing fee Paid in Full Fri 08/16 6:10 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by EJ. Receipt Number 105194. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 08/14 1:20 PM
Summons Served on Charles Ford - served on 8/14/2024 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 08/14 11:56 AM
Summons Issued on Charles Ford Answer Due 09/13/2024 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 11:56 AM
Adversary case 24-01046 Complaint filed by John Patrick Lowe, Trustee (attorney John Patrick Lowe) (As Trustee) against Charles Ford (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))). (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet