Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10003

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 1:15-bk-10005
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 10, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 11, 2015
Terminated:Jun 05, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Sep 04, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WBH Energy GP, LLC
4407 Bee Caves Rd Ste 421
West Lake Hills, TX 78746-6406
Represented By
William A. (Trey) Wood, III
Bracewell & Giuliani LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Sunday, June 07, 2020
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/07 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45 Order Granting Application for Final Decree (Order entered on 6/5/2020)
Friday, June 05, 2020
45 45 order BK-Final Decree (PDF) Fri 06/05 11:04 AM
Order Granting Application for Final Decree (Order entered on 6/5/2020) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/05 11:07 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
44 44 misc ~Document Wed 04/08 1:45 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter Ending March 31, 2020 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
43 43 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 01/15 10:32 AM
Report of Operations for Quarter ending December 31, 2019 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
42 42 misc Notice Withdrawal of Claim Tue 11/12 4:29 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Claim Number: 14) by Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee filed by Steven Shurn for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Shurn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
41 41 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 11/05 11:18 AM
Report of Operations for Quarter ending September 30, 2019 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
40 40 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
Report of Operations for QUARTER ENDING June 30, 2019 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
39 39 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 04/17 3:38 PM
Report of Operations for 3 31-2019 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
38 38 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 01/22 1:30 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter ending 12/31/18 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
37 37 misc ~Document Wed 10/17 3:56 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter Ending September 30, 2018 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
36 36 misc ~Document Thu 07/26 3:16 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter Ending June 30, 2018 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
35 35 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 04/13 1:54 PM
Report of Operations for QUARTER ENDING MARCH 31, 2018 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
34 34 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 01/19 11:21 AM
Report of Operations for QUARTER ENDING DECEMBER 31, 2017 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
33 33 misc Monthly Operating Report Thu 10/26 3:37 PM
Report of Operations for September 30, 2017 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
32 32 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/24 3:49 PM
Report of Operations for June 30, 2017 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
31 31 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 05/05 3:47 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter Ending 3/31/17 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
30 30 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 01/25 10:18 AM
Report of Operations for Quarter ending 12/31/2016 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
29 29 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 10/24 5:28 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter Ending September 30, 2016 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
28 28 misc Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/11 12:27 PM
Report of Operations for Quarter ending June 30, 2016 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
27 27 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 04/13 4:07 PM
Report of Operations for March 31, 2016 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
26 26 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 03/18 4:50 PM
Report of Operations for December 31, 2015 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 03/18 4:49 PM
Report of Operations for SEPTEMBER 30, 2015 filed by Brian W. Zimmerman for Creditor Trustee John D. Mullen, Creditors' Trustee. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2016
24 24 answer Objection to Claim Thu 01/07 8:10 PM
Objection to Claim of U.S. Energy Development Corp. Filed by Kenneth P. Green for Creditor CL III Funding Holding Company, LLC (Green, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 10, 2015
23 23 crbatch Notice Withdraw Claim (batch) Thu 09/10 9:44 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Claim By Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Kaska, Velma)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2015
22 22 order BK-Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (F) (pdf) Fri 09/04 10:55 AM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan, (Order entered on 9/4/2015) (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
court Declaration for Electronic Filing Received Mon 02/02 7:36 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Received Related [+] (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
Declaration for Electronic Filing Received Related [+] (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
Thursday, January 29, 2015
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/29 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Granting Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Treatment (related document(s):3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Master Service List)(Wood, William) (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015)) (Order entered on 1/27/2015)
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/29 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Declaration For Electronic Filing Due Letter Sent to: William (Trey) Wood (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015) -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 2/9/2015
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/29 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Due Letter Sent to: William (Trey) Wood (Related Document(s):3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Master Service List)(Wood, William) (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015)) Overdue Order Due By 2/16/2015
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
18 18 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Tue 01/27 12:23 PM
Order Granting Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Treatment Related [+] (Order entered on 1/27/2015) (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Master Service List)(Wood, William) (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015)
Monday, January 26, 2015
17 17 court Letter-Order Due (F) Mon 01/26 3:43 PM
Order Due Letter Sent to: William (Trey) Wood Related [+] Overdue Order Due By 2/16/2015 (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Master Service List)(Wood, William) (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015)
16 16 misc ~Document Mon 01/26 3:34 PM
Docketed In Error-Declaration for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petitions and Mailing Matrix for WBH Energy, LP, WBH Energy Partners LLC, and WBH Energy GP, LLC filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Wood, William) Related [+] Modified on 1/27/2015 (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
15 15 court Letter-Declaration For Electronic Filing Due (F) Mon 01/26 3:18 PM
Declaration For Electronic Filing Due Letter Sent to: William (Trey) Wood Related [+] -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 2/9/2015 (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
Saturday, January 10, 2015
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/10 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/10/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number (related document(s):2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Master Service List # 2 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 1/8/2015)
Thursday, January 08, 2015
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/08 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/08/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 AMENDED 341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 2/10/2015 at 02:30 PM at Austin Room 118- Proofs of Claim Due 5/11/2015
12 12 order BK-Jointly Administering Cases (pdf) Thu 01/08 7:57 AM
Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number Related [+] (Order entered on 1/8/2015) (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Master Service List # 2 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, January 07, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/07 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Reassigning Case. Tony M. Davis terminated from the case, Judge H. Christopher Mott assigned to case. (Order entered on 1/5/2015)
court Hearing Held Thu 01/08 11:23 AM
Hearing Held: Granted: Order to Come By Trey Wood. Related [+] (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Master Service List # 2 Proposed Order)
court Hearing Held Thu 01/08 11:24 AM
Hearing Held: Granted: Order To Come. Order Due to be filed by Trey Wood. Related [+] Order due by 1/21/2015 (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Master Service List)(Wood, William) (Related Document(s):1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015)
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
10 10 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 01/06 7:00 PM
Motion Exhibit/Witness List for 1st Day Motions filed by Kenneth P. Green for Creditor CL III Funding Holding Company, LLC (Green, Kenneth) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Master Service List # 2 Proposed Order)
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 01/06 6:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Kenneth P. Green for Creditor CL III Funding Holding Company, LLC. (Green, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
8 8 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11/12 (F) Tue 01/06 6:45 AM
AMENDED 341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 2/10/2015 at 02:30 PM at Austin Room 118- Proofs of Claim Due 5/11/2015 (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 05, 2015
7 7 answer Objection Mon 01/05 5:10 PM
Objection Filed by Kenneth P. Green for Creditor CL III Funding Holding Company, LLC (Green, Kenneth) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Master Service List # 2 Proposed Order)
6 6 order BK-Reassigning Case (PDF) Mon 01/05 4:12 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Tony M. Davis terminated from the case, Judge H. Christopher Mott assigned to case. (Order entered on 1/5/2015) (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-]
5 5 court 341 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11/12 (F) Mon 01/05 3:47 PM
Docketed In Error- 341 Meeting of Creditors Set For 2/10/2015 at 02:30 PM at Austin Room 118- Proofs of Claim Due 5/11/2015 (Miiller, Sherri) Modified on 1/6/2015 Incorrect Judge reflected (Miiller, Sherri)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc ~Document Mon 01/05 1:22 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petitions and Mailing Matrix for WBH Energy, LP, WBH Energy Partners LLC, and WBH Energy Partners GP, LLC filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. (Wood, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
3 3 2 pgs misc ~Document Mon 01/05 12:29 PM
Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC.(Wood, William) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Master Service List
2 2 5 pgs motion Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases Mon 01/05 12:04 PM
Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC(Wood, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Master Service List
Att: 2 4 pgs Proposed Order
court Hearing (NO FORM) Mon 01/05 4:17 PM
FIRST DAY Hearings to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+],3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by William A. (Trey) Wood IIIfor Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC. )(Wood, William)) Hearing Scheduled For 1/7/2015 at 02:00 PM at Austin Courtroom 2 ...COUNSEL FOR MOVANT IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING (Farrar, Ronda)
Related: [-] 2 Motion to Consolidate filed by William A. (Trey) Wood III for Debtor WBH Energy GP, LLC1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015
Sunday, January 04, 2015
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Sun 01/04 6:23 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 Without Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1717, ) Filed By WBH Energy GP, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 01/12/2015 (Wood, William)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Sun 01/04 6:25 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 15-10005 [misc,volp11] (1717.00), Amount $1717.00, Receipt 15461168 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1