Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Wendy L Hagenau
Case #: 1:19-bk-65768
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2019
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Star Chain, Inc.
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 17, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 3, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 30, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 27, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 31, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 32, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 33, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 36, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 39, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 41, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 5, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 6, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 8, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 9, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 26, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 21, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 20, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 19, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 18, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 16, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 12, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 11, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 10, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
US Star 1, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
SC Restaurants Management, LLC
11735 Pointe Place
Roswell, GA 30076
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Debtor
Omer Casurluk
270 Cumming St.
Alpharetta, GA 30009
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Wiggam & Geer, LLC
contact info
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 22, 2019 8:29 AM EDT
Creditor
Wallis State Bank
Represented By
Evan M. Altman
Evan M. Altman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Creditor
TET Food Chain, LLC
205 Corporate Center Dr, Suite B
Stockbridge, GA 30253
Represented By
Brad Baldwin
Hecht Walker, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Newk's Franchise Company, LLC
Represented By
Ashley Reynolds Ray
Scroggins & Williamson, P.C.
contact info
J. Robert Williamson
Scroggins & Williamson, P.C.
contact info
J. Hayden Kepner, Jr.
Scroggins & Williamson, P.C.
contact info
Jason B. Binford
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Creditor
McLane Foodservice, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Turner Edwards
Alston & Bird, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hutton QSR, LLC
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP c/o Darryl S. Laddin 171 17th Street NE Suite 2100
Atlanta, GA 30363
Represented By
Darryl S. Laddin
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
contact info
Creditor
Highland Plaza, LP
Represented By
Victor W. Newmark
Wiles And Wiles, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Customized Distribution, LLC
Represented By
Leah Fiorenza McNeill
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Mark I. Duedall
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Creditor
Checkers Drive In Restaurants
Represented By
Bryan E. Bates
Parker Hudson Rainer & Dobbs LLP
contact info
Glenn D. Moses
Genovese, Joblove & Battista
contact info
Michael Charles Sullivan
Parker Hudson Rainer & Dobbs LLP
contact info
Creditor
Captain D's, LLC
Represented By
Kathleen G. Furr
Baker Donelson
contact info
Kevin A. Stine
Baker Donelson
contact info
Timothy J. Colletti
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Byline Bank
Small Herrin, LLP Building 2, Suite 200 2727 Paces Ferry Rd.
Atlanta, GA 30339
Represented By
Anna Mari Humnicky
Small Herrin, LLP
contact info
Edmond M. Burke
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Bainbridge Management, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel H. Park
Mcgahren, Gaskill & York, LLC
contact info
Charles H. Van Horn
Berman Fink Van Horn, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
David S. Weidenbaum
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Atlanta chain with four dozen restaurants files Chapter 11 (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Fri 10/04/2019
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Tue 10/20 7:28 AM
Case Closed (jlc)
Related: [-]