ESCO Marine, Inc. and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 2:15-bk-20107 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 09, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 28, 2015 |
Dismissed: | May 07, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
ESCO Marine, Inc.
16200 Joe Garza, Sr. Road
Brownsville, TX 78521 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
812 | 812
notice
Notice
Wed 03/27 10:56 AM
Notice Request for Removal from Mailing List . Filed by Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership (Fulton, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:39 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2002 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:42 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2008 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:47 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2012 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:49 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2018 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2023 Closed. (rgs4) |